Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1341411 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 604
24.04.2013 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
24.05.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
17.04.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.04.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.04.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
17.04.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
17.04.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.12.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
16.12.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
16.12.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.12.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 46
12.12.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
07.12.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 8
06.12.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 8
31.08.2011 Description Search / examination 1
31.08.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.08.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
01.08.2011 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
01.08.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
28.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.07.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
28.07.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.07.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.07.2011 Description Search / examination 30
18.07.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.07.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.04.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
20.04.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.03.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.03.2011 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 17
22.03.2011 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 17
14.10.2010 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
07.09.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
07.09.2010 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
07.09.2010 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
07.09.2010 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
07.09.2010 Claims Appeal 4
07.09.2010 Claims Appeal 4
07.09.2010 Claims Appeal 4
07.09.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.09.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 2
29.06.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.06.2010 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 40
21.06.2010 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
10.06.2010 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
05.03.2010 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
10.02.2010 General enquiry Appeal 1
03.12.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
24.11.2009 Request concerning the applicant/representative Appeal 1
01.10.2008 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
18.01.2008 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
18.12.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
05.12.2007 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
14.11.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
13.11.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 18
21.08.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
17.07.2007 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
17.07.2007 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
04.07.2007 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
04.07.2007 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
04.07.2007 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
04.07.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
04.07.2007 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
04.07.2007 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
04.07.2007 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 7
04.07.2007 Means of redress Search / examination 1
04.07.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
04.07.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
04.07.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
04.07.2007 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
04.07.2007 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
20.04.2007 Annex Search / examination 3
20.04.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
20.04.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
20.04.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
20.04.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
20.04.2007 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
19.12.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.11.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
28.11.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
23.11.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
23.11.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
23.11.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.11.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
17.10.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.06.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
23.06.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.02.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
24.11.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
24.11.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.07.2003 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
28.07.2003 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
18.07.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.07.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.05.2003 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
02.05.2003 Claims Search / examination 4
02.05.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
10.04.2003 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
10.04.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
27.01.2003 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
27.01.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.01.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.01.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.01.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.01.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
27.01.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
27.01.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.01.2003 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.11.2002 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
18.11.2002 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
18.11.2002 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
16.10.2002 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.10.2002 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
16.10.2002 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
20.09.2002 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
20.09.2002 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
20.09.2002 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
20.08.2002 Written opinion - Automated PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
29.07.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.07.2002 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.07.2002 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
23.07.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 54
18.07.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
18.07.2002 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 50
15.07.2002 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
24.04.2002 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
24.04.2002 Claims International Searching Authority 8
24.04.2002 Description International Searching Authority 41
24.04.2002 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 3