Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1345937

EP1345937 - QUINUCLIDINE CARBAMATE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS M3 ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2006
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.08.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.09.2006  [2006/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Almirall Prodesfarma AG
Lindenhof Dorfstrasse 38
6341 Baar / CH
[N/P]
Former [2005/24]For all designated states
Almirall Prodesfarma AG
Lindenhof Dorfstrasse 38
6341 Baar / CH
Former [2003/39]For all designated states
Almirall Prodesfarma, S.A.
Ronda del General Mitre 151
08022 Barcelona / ES
Inventor(s)01 / BUIL ALBERO, Maria Antonia
Paris, 50, 1o-4
E-08029 Barcelona / ES
02 / FERNANDEZ FORNER, Maria Dolors
Roger de Flor, 221, 5 4
E-08025 Barcelona / ES
03 / PRAT QUINONES, Maria
Calle Andrea Doria, 2, 1 1
E-08003 Barcelona / ES
 [2003/39]
Representative(s)Cresswell, Thomas Anthony , et al
J.A. Kemp & Co.
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/39]Cresswell, Thomas Anthony , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date01989610.920.12.2001
[2003/39]
WO2001EP15169
Priority number, dateES2000000308422.12.2000         Original published format: ES 200003084
[2003/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO02051841
Date:04.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1345937
Date:24.09.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002
[2003/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1345937
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07D453/02, A61K31/439, A61P43/00, C07D471/08, // (C07D471/08, 221:00), C07D209:00
[2003/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/39]
Extension statesAL17.07.2003
LT17.07.2003
LV17.07.2003
MK17.07.2003
RO17.07.2003
SI17.07.2003
TitleGerman:CHINUCLIDINCARBAMAT DERIVATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS M3 ANTAGONISTEN[2003/39]
English:QUINUCLIDINE CARBAMATE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS M3 ANTAGONISTS[2003/39]
French:DERIVES DE CARBAMATE QUINUCLIDINE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME ANTAGONISTES M3[2003/39]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2003National basic fee paid 
17.07.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.07.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/39]
30.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2005Fee for grant paid
01.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36]
Request for further processing for:01.03.2005Request for further processing filed
01.03.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.03.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP0747355  (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1,23-25 * claim - *;
 [DA]EP0801067  (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1,23-25 * claim - *;
 [DPA]WO0104118  (ALMIRALL PRODESFARMA SA [ES], et al) [DPA] 2,23-25 * claim - *;
 [E]WO0200652  (S A L V A T LAB SA [ES], et al) [E] 1-25 * complete document, in particular example 1-7, 10, 13 and 65 *