Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1341735

EP1341735 - METHOD OF MAKING A CERAMIC ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/37]TECHNICAL FIELD
[2019/13]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Silicones Corporation
2200 West Salzburg Road
Midland, MI 48686-0994 / US
[2018/29]
Former [2003/37]For all designated states
Dow Corning Corporation
Midland, Michigan 48611 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FACKLER, Helmut
Heydenstrasse 42
89415 Lauingen / DE
02 / DEMES, Hagen
Waldstrasse 46 A
63179 Obertshausen / DE
 [2003/37]
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[2019/33]
Former [2013/07]Thomson, James B.
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2003/37]Davies, Peter Vaughan
Dow Corning Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Cardiff Road
Barry, CF63 2YL / GB
Application number, filing date01990562.905.12.2001
[2003/37]
WO2001EP14699
Priority number, dateGB2000002977607.12.2000         Original published format: GB 0029776
[2003/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0246118
Date:13.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1341735
Date:10.09.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2002
[2003/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1341735
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:C04B33/08, C04B33/13
[2003/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2019/33]
Former [2003/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KERAMIKGEGENSTANDES[2019/13]
English:METHOD OF MAKING A CERAMIC ARTICLE[2019/13]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN ARTICLE CÉRAMIQUE[2019/13]
Former [2003/37]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KERAMIKGEGESTANDES AUS EINER TONZUSAMMENSETZUNG
Former [2003/37]TECHNICAL FIELD
Former [2003/37]COMPOSITION D'ARGILE
Entry into regional phase19.05.2003National basic fee paid 
19.05.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
19.05.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/37]
29.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2019Fee for grant paid
04.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.10.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
12.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 17
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 18
Cited inInternational search[A]US4226635  (KINDRICK ROBERT H, et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *
by applicantUS4408030
 US4690810
 US5876609