blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1346399

EP1346399 - SEMICONDUCTOR COMPLIANT SUBSTRATE HAVING A GRADED MONOCRYSTALLINE LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 05.11.2008  [2008/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOTOROLA, INC.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US
[2003/39]
Inventor(s)01 / RAMDANI, Jamal
1082 W. Thompson Way
Chandler, AZ 85248 / US
02 / HILT, Lyndee L.
Apartment 2078 3600 W. Ray Road
Chandler, AZ 85226 / US
 [2003/39]
Representative(s)McCormack, Derek James
Optimus Patents Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB
[2008/45]
Former [2003/39]McCormack, Derek James
Motorola, European Intellectual Property Section, Law Department, Midpoint, Alencon Link
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
Application number, filing date01991940.619.11.2001
[2003/39]
WO2001US43744
Priority number, dateUS2000074021918.12.2000         Original published format: US 740219
[2003/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO0250345
Date:27.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1346399
Date:24.09.2003
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.03.2003
ClassificationIPC:H01L21/00, C30B25/02, C30B29/32, C30B23/02, H01L21/20, C30B25/20
[2003/39]
CPC:
H01L21/0237 (EP,US); H01L21/02381 (EP,US); H01L21/02439 (EP,US);
H01L21/02447 (EP,US); H01L21/0245 (EP,US); H01L21/02458 (EP,US);
H01L21/02463 (EP,US); H01L21/02488 (EP,US); H01L21/02505 (EP,US);
H01L21/0251 (EP,US); H01L21/02513 (EP,US); H01L21/02521 (EP,US);
H01L21/02538 (EP,US); H01L21/0254 (EP,US); H01L21/02546 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:HALBLEITERKOMPATIBLES SUBSTRAT MIT MONOKRISTALLINER GRADIENTENSCHICHT[2003/39]
English:SEMICONDUCTOR COMPLIANT SUBSTRATE HAVING A GRADED MONOCRYSTALLINE LAYER[2003/39]
French:SUBSTRAT ADAPTATIF A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR COMPORTANT UNE COUCHE MONOCRISTALLINE CALIBREE[2003/39]
Entry into regional phase18.07.2003National basic fee paid 
22.09.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.09.2003Examination requested  [2003/47]
20.10.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/50]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]US4882300  (INOUE YASUNORI [JP], et al) [X] 23,31 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6107653  (FITZGERALD EUGENE A [US]) [A] 1,8,14-16,22,23,29-31 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4981714  (OHNO HIROTAKA [JP], et al);
 [A]US5225031  (MCKEE RODNEY A [US], et al);
 [A]US5270298  (RAMESH RAMAMOORTHY [US]);
 [A]US5484664  (KITAHARA KUNINORI [JP], et al);
 [A]US6113690  (YU ZHIYI JIMMY [US], et al);
 [A]US5482003  (MCKEE RODNEY A [US], et al)
 [A]  - "INTEGRATION OF GAAS ON SI USING A SPINEL BUFFER LAYER", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (198711), vol. 30, no. 6, ISSN 0018-8689, page 365, XP000952091 [A] 1-3,23,31 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.