blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1332501

EP1332501 - MEMORY MANAGEMENT LOGIC FOR EXPANDING THE UTILIZATION OF READ-ONLY MEMORIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.04.2005  [2005/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2003/32]
Inventor(s)01 / MAHRLA, Peter
Herzog-Ludwig-Strasse 10
85604 Zorneding / DE
 [2003/32]
Representative(s)Graf Lambsdorff, Matthias
Patentanwälte
Lambsdorff & Lange
Dingolfinger Strasse 6
81673 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/32]Graf Lambsdorff, Matthias, Dr.
Patentanwälte Lambsdorff & Lange Dingolfinger Strasse 6
81673 München / DE
Application number, filing date01993932.111.10.2001
[2003/32]
WO2001DE03891
Priority number, dateDE200015509607.11.2000         Original published format: DE 10055096
[2003/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO0239457
Date:16.05.2002
Language:DE
[2002/20]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1332501
Date:06.08.2003
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1332501
Date:21.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.09.2002
ClassificationIPC:G11C17/10
[2003/32]
CPC:
G11C29/822 (EP,US); G06F12/0638 (EP,US); G11C17/10 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/17]
Former [2003/32]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SPEICHERVERWALTUNGSLOGIK ZUR ERWEITERTEN NUTZUNG VON FESTWERTSPEICHERN[2003/32]
English:MEMORY MANAGEMENT LOGIC FOR EXPANDING THE UTILIZATION OF READ-ONLY MEMORIES[2003/32]
French:LOGIQUE DE GESTION DE MEMOIRE POUR EXPLOITATION ELARGIE DE MEMOIRES MORTES[2003/32]
Entry into regional phase28.03.2003National basic fee paid 
28.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.05.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/32]
05.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.02.2004Fee for grant paid
23.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH06103056  ;
 [X]US4601031  (WALKER CHRISTOPHER P H [GB], et al) [X] 1-11,13-17 * column 3, line 10 - column 9, line 59; figure - *;
 [X]EP0333207  (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-12,14-17 * column 3, line 18 - column 9, line 35; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]EP0419202  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,9,11,14,15* figures 6-8 *;
 [XA]EP0509633  (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,7-9,11,14,17 * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 47; figure 1 * * column 8, line 4 - column 9, line 28; figure 5; claims 3,9 * [A] 4,10,15,16;
 [XA]US5757690  (MCMAHON SCOTT H R [US]) [X] 1,5,6,9,10,12-16 * column 3, line 51 - column 7, line 34; figures 1-6 * * column 8, line 20 - column 9, line 13; claims 11-19 * [A] 2-4,20
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940714), vol. 018, no. 376, Database accession no. (P - 1770), & JP06103056 A 19940415 (NEC HOME ELECTRON LTD) [X] 1-5,7,9-12,14,15,17 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.