Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1352315

EP1352315 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ENTERING DATA WITHIN A FLIGHT PLAN ENTRY FIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245
Morristown NJ 07960 / US
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245
Morristown NJ 07960 / US
Former [2003/42]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Avenue, P.O. Box 2245
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GIBBS, Michael, J.
15809 North 8th Place
Phoenix, AZ 85022 / US
02 / MCCROBIE, Daneil, E.
10591 East Autumn Sage Drive
Scottsdale, AZ 85259 / US
03 / LEWIS, Daniel, E.
5353 Whispering Wind Drive
Glendale, AZ 85310 / US
04 / CHASE, Karl, L.
4335 W. Villa Rita Drive
Glendale, AZ 85308 / US
05 / ADAMS, Michael, B.
5419 E. Corrine Drive
Scottsdale, AZ 85254 / US
06 / VAN OMEN, Debi
7629 East Phantom Way
Scottsdale, AZ 85255 / US
 [2003/42]
Representative(s)Haley, Stephen , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Haley, Stephen , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2003/42]Hucker, Charlotte Jane
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date01995320.714.11.2001
[2003/42]
WO2001US45790
Priority number, dateUS2000071530817.11.2000         Original published format: US 715308
[2003/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0241131
Date:23.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/21]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1352315
Date:15.10.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2002
[2003/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1352315
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:G08G5/00, // G01C23/00
[2008/36]
Former International [2003/42]G06F3/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/42]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINGABE VON DATEN IN EINEM FLUGPLAN EINGABEFELD[2003/42]
English:A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ENTERING DATA WITHIN A FLIGHT PLAN ENTRY FIELD[2003/42]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'ENTREE DE DONNEES DANS UN CHAMP D'ENTREE DE PLAN DE VOL[2003/42]
Entry into regional phase09.06.2003National basic fee paid 
09.06.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
09.06.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.06.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/42]
06.09.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
20.10.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
06.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2008Fee for grant paid
23.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
06.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
06.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IT25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
TR25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
IE14.11.2009
LU14.11.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/21]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IT25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
IE14.11.2009
LU14.11.2009
Former [2011/14]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IT25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
IE14.11.2009
Former [2010/46]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
IE14.11.2009
Former [2009/49]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/46]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
Former [2009/43]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
Former [2009/40]AT25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
Former [2009/37]FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
Former [2009/34]NL25.02.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]US6112141  (BRIFFE MICHEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-28 * figures 1,9 * * column 33, lines 15-67 * * column 34, lines 45-56 * * column 38, lines 9-32 *;
 [A]EP0743580  (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-28 * figure 1 * * column 3, lines 55-60 * * column 4, lines 1-45 *