blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1348232

EP1348232 - METHOD FOR CONTACTING A DOPING AREA ON A SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.03.2008
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 06.08.2008  [2008/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2007/21]
Former [2003/40]For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / RUF, Alexander
Scariastrasse 8
01277 Dresden / DE
02 / URBANSKY, Norbert
Dahlienweg 8
01159 Dresden / DE
03 / CLAUSSEN, Wilhelm
Dorothea-Erxleben-Strasse 10
01129 Dresden / DE
04 / GÄRTNER, Thomas
Lindenweg 11
01458 Ottendorf-Okrilla / DE
05 / SCHMIDBAUER, Sven
Forststrasse 27
01099 Dresden / DE
 [2003/40]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schlossschmidstrasse 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/40]Epping Hermann & Fischer
Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date01995583.006.12.2001
[2003/40]
WO2001DE04590
Priority number, dateDE200110017804.01.2001         Original published format: DE 10100178
[2003/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO02054470
Date:11.07.2002
Language:DE
[2002/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1348232
Date:01.10.2003
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1348232
Date:23.05.2007
Language:DE
[2007/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.01.2003
ClassificationIPC:H01L21/28, H01L21/285, H01L21/768
[2003/40]
CPC:
H01L21/76843 (EP,US); H01L21/28 (KR); H01L21/28518 (EP,US);
H01L21/76856 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2004/22]
Former [2003/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR KONTAKTIERUNG EINES DOTIERGEBIETS EINES HALBLEITERBAUELEMENTS[2003/40]
English:METHOD FOR CONTACTING A DOPING AREA ON A SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT[2003/40]
French:PROCEDE D'ETABLISSEMENT DES CONTACTS D'UNE ZONE DOPEE D'UN COMPOSANT A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR[2003/40]
Entry into regional phase06.06.2003National basic fee paid 
06.06.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
06.06.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.08.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/40]
23.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2007Fee for grant paid
04.04.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.02.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT23.05.2007
FR18.01.2008
[2008/32]
Former [2008/23]IT23.05.2007
Cited inInternational search[XY]US4701349  (KOYANAGI MITSUMASA [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 65 - column 5, line 46 * [Y] 4-6;
 [Y]US6121134  (BURTON RANDLE D [US], et al) [Y] 4-6 * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 3 *;
 [X]US5639678  (LEE CHANG-JAE [KR], et al) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * column 5, line 4 - line 18 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.