Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1337183 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1337183



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 446
08.07.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
31.03.2006 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
14.04.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.02.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.02.2005 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
18.02.2005 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
08.12.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
08.12.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
08.12.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 37
08.11.2004 Claims Search / examination 3
08.11.2004 Description Search / examination 30
08.11.2004 Drawings Search / examination 4
08.11.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.10.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
07.10.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
07.10.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
03.08.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
03.08.2004 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
03.08.2004 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
22.07.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
15.07.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
28.06.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
28.06.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.06.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
07.06.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
07.06.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
13.04.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
13.04.2004 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
13.04.2004 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
24.03.2004 Claims Search / examination 3
24.03.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
29.01.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
21.01.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.09.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
17.09.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.07.2003 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
25.07.2003 Claims Search / examination 5
16.07.2003 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.07.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.07.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.07.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.07.2003 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
02.07.2003 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
16.06.2003 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
23.05.2003 Annex Search / examination 2
23.05.2003 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 2
23.05.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
20.05.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.05.2003 Document concerning representation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.05.2003 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.05.2003 Document concerning representation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
28.04.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.04.2003 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
16.04.2003 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
14.04.2003 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
17.03.2003 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
17.03.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
03.02.2003 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
03.02.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.02.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.02.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
03.02.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
03.02.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
03.02.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
03.02.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.02.2003 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.12.2002 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
23.12.2002 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
28.11.2002 Grant of extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.11.2002 Request for extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.08.2002 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.08.2002 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
21.08.2002 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
03.07.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.07.2002 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.06.2002 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
19.06.2002 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.06.2002 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
18.06.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
18.06.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 42
13.06.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
13.06.2002 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 42
29.05.2002 Notification relating to priority claim Search / examination 1
07.02.2002 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
07.02.2002 Claims International Searching Authority 7
07.02.2002 Description International Searching Authority 29
07.02.2002 Drawings International Searching Authority 4
18.12.2001 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
18.12.2001 Priority document Search / examination 27
18.12.2001 Priority document Search / examination 42