Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1337183
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7811265Global Dossier 12.10.2010B2
US2004092821 13.05.2004A1
Priority number Date
DE10058370 24.11.2000
EP0113535 21.11.2001
DE10134911 18.07.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1337183Global Dossier 25.05.2005B1
EP1337183 27.08.2003A1
Priority number Date
DE10058370 24.11.2000
EP0113535 21.11.2001
DE10134911 18.07.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT296057T 15.06.2005T
Priority number Date
DE10058370 24.11.2000
EP0113535 21.11.2001
DE10134911 18.07.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2634702 18.06.2002A
Priority number Date
DE10058370 24.11.2000
EP0113535 21.11.2001
DE10134911 18.07.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2429725 09.02.2010C
CA2429725 13.06.2002A1
Priority number Date
DE10058370 24.11.2000
EP0113535 21.11.2001
DE10134911 18.07.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE10058370 06.06.2002A1
Priority number Date
DE10058370 24.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE10134911 06.02.2003A1
Priority number Date
DE10134911 18.07.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE50106342D 30.06.2005D1
Priority number Date
DE50106342 21.11.2001
DE10058370 24.11.2000
EP0113535 21.11.2001
DE10134911 18.07.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK1337183T 26.09.2005T3
Priority number Date
DE10058370 24.11.2000
EP0113535 21.11.2001
DE10134911 18.07.2001
EP01995652 21.11.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EA005391 24.02.2005B1
EA200300605 25.12.2003A1
Priority number Date
DE10058370 24.11.2000
EP0113535 21.11.2001
DE10134911 18.07.2001
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO0245588Global Dossier 13.06.2002A1
Priority number Date
DE10058370 24.11.2000
DE10134911 18.07.2001
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2243595T 01.12.2005T3
Priority number Date
DE10058370 24.11.2000
DE10134911 18.07.2001
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT1337183E 31.10.2005E
Priority number Date
DE10058370 24.11.2000
DE10134911 18.07.2001