Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1337183

EP1337183 - ULTRASONIC PROBE COMPRISING A POSITIONING DEVICE FOR EXAMINATION DEVICES AND OPERATION DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.03.2006
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 16.05.2007  [2007/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Innovacell Biotechnologie GmbH
Andreas-Hofer-Strasse 6
6020 Innsbruck / AT
[2005/21]
Former [2003/35]For all designated states
Innovacell Biotechnology GmbH
Andreas-Hofer-Strasse 6
6020 Innsbruck / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Hering, Steffen
Müllerstrasse 33
A-6020 Innsbruck / AT
02 / Strasser, Hannes
Obere Lend 6
A-6060 Hall / AT
03 / Marksteiner, Rainer
Rennhammergasse 35
A-6360 Schwaz / AT
 [2003/35]
Representative(s)Hertz, Oliver
v. Bezold & Partner
Patentanwälte - PartG mbB
Akademiestrasse 7
80799 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/35]Hertz, Oliver, Dr.
v. Bezold & Sozien, Akademiestrasse 7
80799 München / DE
Application number, filing date01995652.321.11.2001
[2003/35]
WO2001EP13535
Priority number, dateDE200015837024.11.2000         Original published format: DE 10058370
DE200113491118.07.2001         Original published format: DE 10134911
[2003/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0245588
Date:13.06.2002
Language:DE
[2002/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1337183
Date:27.08.2003
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2002
[2003/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1337183
Date:25.05.2005
Language:DE
[2005/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61B8/12
[2003/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/35]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ULTRASCHALLSONDE MIT POSITIONIEREINRICHTUNG FÜR UNTERSUCHUNGS- UND OPERATIONSVORRICHTUNGEN[2003/35]
English:ULTRASONIC PROBE COMPRISING A POSITIONING DEVICE FOR EXAMINATION DEVICES AND OPERATION DEVICES[2003/35]
French:SONDE A ULTRASONS DOTEE D'UN SYSTEME DE POSITIONNEMENT DESTINE A DES DISPOSITIFS D'EXPLORATION ET D'INTERVENTION[2003/35]
Entry into regional phase23.05.2003National basic fee paid 
23.05.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
23.05.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/35]
25.07.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
07.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
15.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
07.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2005Fee for grant paid
18.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR25.08.2005
CY21.11.2005
[2007/20]
Former [2006/14]GR25.08.2005
Cited inInternational search[A]US4869258  (HETZ WALTER [DE]) [A] 1,19 * figure 5; claim 31 *;
 [A]US4877033  (SEITZ JR H MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1,19 * column 7, lines 45-67 *;
 [A]US4883059  (STEDMAN DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1,19 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0446645  (ACOUSTIC IMAGING TECH [US]);
 [A]US5235987  (WOLFE JEROME K [US]);
 [A]US4911173  (TERWILLIGER RICHARD A [US]);
 [PA]US6238336  (OUCHI TERUO [JP]) [PA] 1,19 * column 2, lines 29-37; figure 1 *
ExaminationUS4763662
 JPH11244289
 WO9632889
by applicantUS4363326
 US4402324
 US4489730
 US4542747
 US4635644
 US5052396
 US4742829
 US5343865