Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1399833

EP1399833 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PROVIDING APPLICATION LEVEL PRESENCE INFORMATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT & T Mobility II, LLC
Corporation Trust Centre 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, Newcastle, DE / US
[2017/16]
Former [2009/51]For all designated states
AT & T Mobility II, LLC
Corporation Trust Centre 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, Newcastle, DE / US
Former [2007/48]For all designated states
AT&T Mobility II LLC
Corporation Trust Centre 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, Newcastle, DE / US
Former [2006/23]For all designated states
Cingular Wireless II, LLC
Corporation Trust Centre 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, Newcastle, DE / US
Former [2004/13]For all designated states
AT & T Wireless Services, Inc.
P.O. Box 97059, WTC2
Redmont, WA 98073-9759 / US
Inventor(s)01 / AGRAWAL, Anuraag
13711 N.E. 10th Place, A3-101
Bellevue, WA 98005 / US
 [2004/13]
Representative(s)Harding, Andrew Philip , et al
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/16]Harding, Andrew Philip , et al
Forresters
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Former [2012/13]Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles , et al
Forrester & Boehmert
SkyGarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Former [2008/44]Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 Munich / DE
Former [2004/13]Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles
Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date01997932.720.11.2001
[2004/13]
WO2001US43228
Priority number, dateUS20000249982P20.11.2000         Original published format: US 249982 P
[2004/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0243351
Date:30.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1399833
Date:24.03.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002
[2004/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1399833
Date:19.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.12.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.10.2005
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/53, H04L29/08
[2005/37]
Former International [2004/13]G06F15/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2017/16]
Former [2004/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON ANWESENHEITSINFORMATIONEN AUF ANWENDUNGSEBENE IN DER DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATION[2004/13]
English:METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PROVIDING APPLICATION LEVEL PRESENCE INFORMATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION[2004/13]
French:PROCEDES ET SYSTEMES OFFRANT DES INFORMATIONS DE PRESENCE DE NIVEAU D'APPLICATION DANS UNE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2004/13]
Entry into regional phase04.06.2003National basic fee paid 
04.06.2003Search fee paid 
04.06.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.06.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.06.2003Examination requested  [2004/13]
21.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
11.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2017Fee for grant paid
09.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.09.2006
Opposition(s)22.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
06.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
06.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
07.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
06.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
07.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
07.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
07.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
07.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
06.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
07.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200303   M06   Fee paid on   04.03.2004
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.04.2017
CY19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
MC19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
GR20.07.2017
IE20.11.2017
LU20.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2018/50]AT19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
MC19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
GR20.07.2017
IE20.11.2017
LU20.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/45]AT19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
MC19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
GR20.07.2017
IE20.11.2017
LU20.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/41]AT19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
MC19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
GR20.07.2017
LU20.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/33]AT19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
MC19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
GR20.07.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/15]AT19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
GR20.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
GR20.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
GR20.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
GR20.07.2017
Former [2017/48]NL19.04.2017
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9948011  (ADVANCED WEB SOLUTIONS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,7-11,17,18,28 * page 3, line 20 - line 28 * * page 4, line 13 - page 5, line 30 * * page 10, line 3 - line 21 * * page 11, line 27 - line 29 * * page 20, line 1 - line 32 * * figures 1,4a * * abstract * [Y] 4-6,19-22,29,30;
 [YA]EP1021021  (IBM [US]) [Y] 19-21,29,30 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0037] * * figure 1 * * abstract * [A] 1,7,17,28;
 [YA]  - SILVER A ET AL, "Unified Network Presence Management", REPORT, (20000521), XP002195089 [Y] 4-6,22 * page 2 - page 5 * [A] 1,7,17,28
 [A]  - APPELZELLER G ET AL, "The Mobile People Architecture", TECHNICAL REPORT, (199901), XP002173449 [A] 1,7,17,28 * page 5 - page 9 *
 [A]  - CALSYN ET AL, "Presence Information Protocol Requirements draft-dussealt-pipr-00.txt", INTERNET DRAFT, (19980209), XP002173450 [A] 1,17,28 * page 4 - page 5 *
International search[XP]US2002035605  (MCDOWELL MARK [US], et al);
 [XP]US2002007398  (MENDIOLA DENNIS [US], et al);
 [XP]US2001042126  (WONG LEON C [US], et al);
 [XP]US2001034224  (MCDOWELL MARK [US], et al);
 [XP]US2002021307  (GLENN STEVE [US], et al);
 [XP]US6301609  (ARAVAMUDAN MURALI [US], et al)
by applicantWO9948011