Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1243442

EP1243442 - NONCONTACT IC CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.09.2016
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.09.2016No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.10.2016  [2016/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2015/39]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OHTA, Eiji, SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / YAMAZAKI, Norihiko, SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
03 / MATSUMURA, Shinichi, SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2015/46]
Former [2002/39]01 / OHTA, Eiji, SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
02 / YAMAZAKI, Norihiko, SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
03 / MATSUMURA, Shinichi, SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[2015/46]
Former [2011/02]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Former [2008/41]Müller, Frithjof E.
Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Former [2002/39]Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing.
Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date01998452.522.11.2001
[2002/39]
WO2001JP10246
Priority number, dateJP2000036596730.11.2000         Original published format: JP 2000365967
[2002/39]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0243967
Date:06.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1243442
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2002
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1243442
Date:11.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.06.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/07, G06K19/077
[2015/18]
Former International [2002/39]B42D15/10, G06K19/07, G06K19/077
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [2015/46]
Former [2004/20]DE,  FI,  FR,  GB,  SE 
Former [2002/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:BERÜHRUNGSLOSE IC KARTE[2002/39]
English:NONCONTACT IC CARD[2002/39]
French:CARTE A CIRCUIT INTEGRE SANS CONTACT[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2002Translation filed 
17.07.2002National basic fee paid 
17.07.2002Search fee paid 
07.11.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
07.11.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/02]
02.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.08.2015Fee for grant paid
14.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.06.2010
Opposition(s)12.08.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
15.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
10.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
23.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
23.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
[2016/24]
Former [2016/23]SE11.11.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2000137781  ;
 [A]JP2000057295  ;
 [A]JP2000222549  ;
 [A]US4719140  (HARA KAZUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,7 * the whole document *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001006), vol. 2000, no. 08, [X] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000914), vol. 2000, no. 05, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, [A] 1,2,4,5 * abstract *
International search[X]JP2000048151  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD);
 [X]JPH10203059  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [Y]JP2000311225  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH1076779  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD);
 [Y]JP2000309181  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD);
 [XE]JP2001351076  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD)
by applicantJP2000137781