Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1345262

EP1345262 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING SILICON WAFER AND SILICON WAFER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.2017No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.03.2017  [2017/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMCO CORPORATION
2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2006/31]
Former [2003/38]For all designated states
Sumitomo Mitsubishi Silicon Corporation
2-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-0023 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NAKADA, Yoshinobu
c/o SUMCO CORPORATION
2-1, Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8634 / JP
02 / SHIRAKI, Hiroyuki
c/o SUMCO CORPORATION
2-1, Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8634 / JP
 [2016/16]
Former [2004/02]01 / NAKADA, Yoshinobu, c/o Sumitomo Mitubishi Sil.Corp
2-1, Shinaura 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8634 / JP
02 / SHIRAKI, Hiroyuki, c/o Sumitomo Mitsubishi Sil.Corp
2-1, Shinaura 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8634 / JP
Former [2003/38]01 / NAKADA, Yoshinobu, c/o Sumitomo Mitubishi Sil.Corp
2-1, Shinaura 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8634 / JP
02 / SHIRAKI, Hiroyuki, c/o Sumitom Mitsubishi Sil.Corp
2-1, Shinaura 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8634 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2016/16]
Former [2003/38]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date01998993.828.11.2001
[2003/38]
WO2001JP10385
Priority number, dateJP2000036091328.11.2000         Original published format: JP 2000360913
JP2001013921609.05.2001         Original published format: JP 2001139216
JP2001029114525.09.2001         Original published format: JP 2001291145
[2003/38]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0245149
Date:06.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1345262
Date:17.09.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2002
[2003/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1345262
Date:20.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.06.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2007
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/322
[2003/38]
Designated contracting statesDE [2016/16]
Former [2004/22]DE 
Former [2003/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SILIZIUMWAFERS UND SILIZIUMWAFER[2003/38]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING SILICON WAFER AND SILICON WAFER[2003/38]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE TRANCHE DE SILICIUM ET TRANCHE DE SILICIUM[2003/38]
Entry into regional phase04.06.2003Translation filed 
04.06.2003National basic fee paid 
04.06.2003Search fee paid 
04.06.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/38]
12.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2010Date of oral proceedings
06.04.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
21.06.2010Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
09.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2016Fee for grant paid
01.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Appeal following examination20.08.2010Appeal received No.  T2255/10
02.11.2010Statement of grounds filed
23.04.2015Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
23.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
22.05.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.10.2007
Opposition(s)23.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
26.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
26.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
27.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
23.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
14.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
16.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
18.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0067299  (STEAG RTP SYSTEMS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-12 * abstract * * page 7, line 4 - line 9 *;
 [X]WO0013211  (MEMC ELECTRONIC MATERIALS [US]) [X] 1-3,5,8-12 * page 12, line 15 - page 13, line 15; figure 1 *;
 [PX]WO0188974  (MATTSON THERMAL PRODUCTS GMBH [DE]; LERCH WILFRIED [DE]; NIESS JUERGEN) [PX] 1-3,5-12 * figure 2b *
International search[X]JPH1192283  ;
 [XP]JP2001351917