Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1345262 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1345262



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 616
24.02.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
20.04.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
24.03.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.03.2016 Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) Search / examination 2
01.03.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.03.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
01.03.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
01.03.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
09.11.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
09.11.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 4
09.11.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 33
23.10.2015 Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) Search / examination 1
04.09.2015 Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) Search / examination 1
25.08.2015 Claims Search / examination 1
25.08.2015 Description Search / examination 17
25.08.2015 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 2
06.08.2015 Annex to a communication Appeal 18
06.08.2015 Communication concerning deficiencies in subsequently filed documents Search / examination 1
23.06.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.06.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Search / examination 33
18.06.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 33
18.06.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.06.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 1
22.05.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.05.2015 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 30
20.03.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 37
20.03.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
20.03.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
20.03.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 6
20.01.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.01.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.01.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
15.01.2015 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 9
13.01.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
26.09.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
03.04.2013 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
01.02.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
18.11.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
02.11.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
02.11.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
20.08.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
25.06.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
23.06.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
21.06.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
21.06.2010 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
21.06.2010 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
21.06.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 8
21.06.2010 Means of redress Search / examination 2
06.04.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
06.04.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
06.04.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
06.04.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
06.04.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
06.04.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
06.04.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
24.02.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
24.02.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
24.02.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
24.02.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 8
07.08.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.08.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 2
03.08.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
03.08.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
27.07.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
01.04.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
01.04.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
21.02.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
12.02.2008 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
12.02.2008 Translation of priority document Search / examination 41
12.02.2008 Translation of priority document Search / examination 23
12.02.2008 Translation of priority document Search / examination 18
08.02.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.10.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
12.10.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.10.2007 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
17.09.2007 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
21.08.2007 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
02.08.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.08.2007 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
03.07.2006 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
22.06.2006 Request for change of name Search / examination 10
06.08.2003 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
08.07.2003 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
02.07.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.07.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.06.2003 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.06.2003 Claims Search / examination 3
04.06.2003 Description Search / examination 22
04.06.2003 Drawings Search / examination 10
04.06.2003 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
04.06.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
04.06.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
11.04.2003 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
17.10.2002 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
13.06.2002 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.06.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 18
11.06.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 38
11.06.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
06.06.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
06.06.2002 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 1
06.06.2002 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 30