Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260454

EP1260454 - Unit dose packaging system with child resistance and senior friendly features [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/48]Unit dose packaging system with child resistance and senior friedly features
[2003/41]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.01.2009
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 24.11.2010  [2010/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MeadWestvaco Corporation
One High Ridge Park
Stamford CT 06905 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/11]For all designated states
MeadWestvaco Corporation
One High Ridge Park
Stamford, CT 06905 / US
Former [2004/11]For all designated states
Meadwestvaco Corporation
One High Ridge Park
Stamford, CT 06905 / US
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
WESTVACO CORPORATION
One High Ridge Park
Stamford, CT 06905 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Jones, Brad A.
4906 Tulip Oak Road
Chesterfield, VA 23832 / US
02 / Karow, Meredith M.
5715 Saddle Hill Drive
Midlothian, VA 23112 / US
03 / Sasthav, Mohan
7906 Red Barn Way
Elkridge, MD 21075 / US
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Eder, Christian
Eder Schieschke & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Elisabethstrasse 34/II
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Eder, Christian, Dipl.-Ing.
Eder & Schieschke Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 34/II
80796 München / DE
Application number, filing date02000468.508.01.2002
[2002/48]
Priority number, dateUS2001086044321.05.2001         Original published format: US 860443
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1260454
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1260454
Date:09.07.2003
[2003/28]
Type: A9 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP1260454
Date:02.01.2004
[2004/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1260454
Date:12.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:B65D83/04, B65D5/38
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
TitleGerman:Verpackung für Einzeldosen mit Kindersicherung und Seniorfreundlichen Merkmalen[2002/48]
English:Unit dose packaging system with child resistance and senior friendly features[2003/41]
French:Emballage pour dose unitaire à l'épreuve des enfants et d'usage facile pour des personnes âgées[2007/29]
Former [2002/48]Unit dose packaging system with child resistance and senior friedly features
Former [2002/48]Emballage pour dose unitaire muni de charactéristiques à l'épreuve d'enfants et facilitant l'usage pour des personnes âgées
Examination procedure08.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/12]
30.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2007Fee for grant paid
13.12.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.12.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
25.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY12.03.2008
GR13.06.2008
PT18.08.2008
[2010/47]
Former [2009/42]CY12.03.2008
PT18.08.2008
Former [2008/49]PT18.08.2008
Documents cited:Search[E]EP1293436  (WESTVACO CORP [US]) [E] 1-13 * figure -; claim - *;
 [DA]US6047829  (JOHNSTONE SCOTT BOWEN [US], et al) [DA] 1,5,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE7625899U  (PRAGER FA CARL MAX [DE]) [A] 1,5,8 * figure -; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE7921550U  (AKRAPOVIC JOZO) [A] 1,5,8 * page 13, line 1 - line 20; figure 4 *;
 [A]EP0425279  (TRI ENGLE SYST [NZ]) [A] 1,6,13 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 8; figure - *;
 [PA]FR2806062  (BODET JEAN [FR]) [PA] 1,6,13 * figure -; claim 1 *
by applicantUS6047829