blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1225347

EP1225347 - Fastening element and fastening device for profiles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.10.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.2009Change - representativepublished on 13.01.2010  [2010/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KUKA Roboter GmbH
Blücherstrasse 144
86165 Augsburg / DE
[2002/30]
Inventor(s)01 / Karlinger, Stefan
Bobinger-Strasse 50
86199 Augsburg / DE
 [2002/30]
Representative(s)Lempert, Jost, et al
LICHTI Patentanwälte
Postfach 41 07 60
76207 Karlsruhe / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/02]Lempert, Jost, et al
LICHTI Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60
76207 Karlsruhe / DE
Former [2002/30]Lempert, Jost, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer.nat., et al
Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60
76207 Karlsruhe / DE
Application number, filing date02000491.709.01.2002
[2002/30]
Priority number, dateDE200110252820.01.2001         Original published format: DE 10102528
[2002/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1225347
Date:24.07.2002
Language:DE
[2002/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1225347
Date:17.12.2003
Language:DE
[2003/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.04.2002
ClassificationIPC:F16B37/04, F16B7/18
[2002/30]
CPC:
F16B7/187 (EP,US); F16B37/045 (EP,US); F16B2200/20 (EP,US);
F16B2200/40 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2003/16]
Former [2002/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Klemmelement und Vorrichtung zum Festlegen von Nockenschienen[2002/30]
English:Fastening element and fastening device for profiles[2002/30]
French:Elément de fixation et dispositiv de fixation pour profilés[2002/30]
Examination procedure16.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/14]
25.01.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
29.01.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.05.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, TR
31.07.2003Fee for grant paid
31.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.03.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
06.03.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
06.03.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
06.03.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
06.03.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
06.03.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
06.03.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
06.03.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
06.03.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
06.03.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
06.03.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
06.03.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
06.03.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
06.03.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0343942  (EGE EUGEN) [X] 1-4 * Zusammenfassung * * figures 1,2 * * claims 1,2,5 * * column 3, lines 40-46 * [A] 5-12;
 [XA]US5116161  (FAISST DIETER [CH]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [A] 5-12;
 [XA]DE4108175  (COMBE GMBH & CO ROHRBAU [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 2, lines 33-43 * * figure 2 * [A] 5-12;
 [XA]US5839787  (MAGNUSON RICHARD C [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 8-11 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 11 *[A] 5-12
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.