Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240818

EP1240818 - Cutting clamp for silage [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2007
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 17.10.2007  [2007/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Trioliet Mullos B.V.
Postbus 134
7570 Odenzaal / NL
[2006/44]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
TRIOLIET MULLOS B.V.
Postbus 134
7570 Odenzaal / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Van der Plas, Nicolaas
De Kalder 8
7576 WB Oldenzaal / NL
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02000540.109.01.2002
[2002/38]
Priority number, dateDE2001204426U14.03.2001         Original published format: DE 20104426 U
[2002/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240818
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1240818
Date:02.11.2006
Language:DE
[2006/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:A01F25/20
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL [2003/23]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Silage-Schneidzange[2002/38]
English:Cutting clamp for silage[2002/38]
French:Pince coupante pour ensilage[2002/38]
Examination procedure13.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/20]
20.03.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
10.07.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR
12.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.2006Fee for grant paid
14.09.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.08.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.04.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
18.03.2003IE   M02   Fee paid on   20.03.2003
24.04.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIE02.11.2006
IT02.11.2006
[2007/42]
Former [2007/37]IT02.11.2006
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0562542  (HEIDE HANS VON DER [DE]) [DA] 1,2,5,6,11,12 * column 3, line 10 - line 47 * * figure 1 *;
 [DA]DE29916030U  (STRAUTMANN & SOEHNE [DE]) [DA] 1-3 * page 3 - page 4 * * figure 1 *;
 [DA]FR2773433  (SOC D CONSTRUCTION MECANIQUE D [FR]) [DA] 1-3 * page 6, line 4 - page 10, line 26 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [DA]GB2087206  (WOLF JOHANN GMBH KG) [DA] 1,2,5 * page 3, line 56 - line 114 * * figure 4 *;
 [DA]EP0506158  (TRIOLIET MULLOS [NL]) [DA] 1,11,12 * column 2, line 53 - column 13, line 44 * * figures 1,2,15,16A,16B *
by applicantDE29920834U
 EP0562542
 DE29916030U
 DE4332267
 FR2754671
 EP0599151
 FR2773433
 GB2087206