Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260980

EP1260980 - Information storage medium, information recording method, and information recording/reproduction apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.12.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.01.2010  [2010/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ando, Hideo, K.K. Toshiba, Intellectual Prop. Div.
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
02 / Watabe, Kazuo, K.K.Toshiba, Intellectual Prop. Div.
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel
Möhlstrasse 37
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date02000608.610.01.2002
[2002/48]
Priority number, dateJP2001014353014.05.2001         Original published format: JP 2001143530
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1260980
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1260980
Date:13.08.2003
[2003/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:G11B20/12, G11B7/007, G11B7/13, G11B7/006, G11B19/04
[2003/33]
Former International [2002/48]G11B20/12, G11B7/007, G11B7/13
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/19]
Former [2002/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium, Verfahren zur Aufzeichnung von Informationen, und Gerät zur Aufzeichnung/Wiedergabe von Informationen[2002/48]
English:Information storage medium, information recording method, and information recording/reproduction apparatus[2002/48]
French:Support d'enregistrement d'informations, méthode d'enregistrement d'informations, appareil d'enregistrement/reproduction d'informations[2003/33]
Former [2002/48]Support d' enregistrement d' informations, méthode d' enregistrement d' informations, appareil d' enregistrement/reproduction d' informations
Examination procedure10.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
10.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/04]
08.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
12.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200908   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0843305  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 1, line 3 * * page 9, lines 48,49; figure 21 * [A] 4-6,9-14;
 [XA]US6031814  (NAGATA KEN ICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 1, lines 12,13 * * column 12, lines 63-66; figure 21 * [A] 4-6,9-14;
 [XA]EP0825591  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 3 - line 36 * [A] 4-6,9-14;
 [A]JP2001084598
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010710), vol. 2000, no. 20, [A] 10 * abstract *