Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1223545

EP1223545 - Electric or electronic circuit device and method for protection of the circuit against manipulation and/or misuse [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  24.09.2004
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2009Change - applicantpublished on 18.11.2009  [2009/47]
Applicant(s)For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:AT  BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[2009/47]
Former [2003/20]For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:AT  BE  CH  LI  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2002/40]For:DE 
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:AT  BE  CH  LI  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2002/29]For:DE 
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH
Weisshausstrasse 2
52066 Aachen / DE
For:AT  BE  CH  LI  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Fuhrmann, Johann, Philips Corp. Intel. Prop. GmbH
Weisshausstrasse 2
52066 Aachen / DE
02 / Bretschneider, Ernst, Philips Cor. Int. Prop. GmbH
Weisshausstrasse 2
52066 Aachen / DE
03 / Einfeldt, Walter, Philips Corp. Intel. Prop. GmbH
Weisshausstrasse 2
52066 Aachen / DE
 [2002/29]
Representative(s)Volmer, Georg
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Postfach 50 04 42
52088 Aachen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Volmer, Georg
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42
52088 Aachen / DE
Former [2002/29]Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing.
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Weisshausstr. 2
52066 Aachen / DE
Application number, filing date02000658.111.01.2002
[2002/29]
Priority number, dateDE200110133013.01.2001         Original published format: DE 10101330
[2002/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1223545
Date:17.07.2002
Language:DE
[2002/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1223545
Date:04.06.2003
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/073
[2002/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/29]
TitleGerman:Elektrische oder Elektronische Schaltungsanordnung und Verfahren zum Schützen der selben vor Manipulation und/oder vor Missbrauch[2002/29]
English:Electric or electronic circuit device and method for protection of the circuit against manipulation and/or misuse[2002/29]
French:Dispositif a circuit electrique/Electronique et procede pour protection du circuit contre la manipulation et/ou les usages abusifs[2002/29]
Examination procedure04.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/06]
15.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/46]
21.06.2004Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[YD]DE19738990  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [YD] 1-15 * column 9, line 1 - column 11, line 5; figures 1,2,7 *;
 [Y]US4868489  (KOWALSKI JACEK [FR]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19639033  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 6 * column 1, line 38 - line 66; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE4018688  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 5 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 7; figure 1 *