EP1231411 - Toroidal continuously variable transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/33] | Toiroidal continuously variable transmission | ||
[2004/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY, LIMITED 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Haruhito 455-305, Futoo-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-0031 / JP | 02 /
Sugihara, Jun 5-35-8, Shonantakatori Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 237-0066 / JP | [2002/33] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02000962.7 | 16.01.2002 | [2002/33] | Priority number, date | JP20010035535 | 13.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001035535 | [2002/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1231411 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1231411 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | [2003/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1231411 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16H15/38 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
F16H15/38 (EP,US);
F16H61/664 (EP,US);
F16H61/6648 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/10] |
Former [2002/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Stufenloses Toroidgetriebe | [2002/33] | English: | Toroidal continuously variable transmission | [2004/40] | French: | Transmission toroidale à variation continue | [2002/33] |
Former [2002/33] | Toiroidal continuously variable transmission | Examination procedure | 16.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 24.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH07198014 ; | [A]EP1048878 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1 * figure - * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07198014 A 19950801 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [DA] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH07198014 | JP2001165265 |