Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1226801

EP1226801 - Absorbent article [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.08.2006
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KAO CORPORATION
14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho, 1-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/41]For all designated states
KAO CORPORATION
14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho, 1-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2002/31]For all designated states
KAO CORPORATION
14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho, 1-chome
Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kusagawa, Tetsuya, c/o Kao Corporation Res. Lab.
2606 Akabane, Ichikai-machi
Haga-gun, Tochigi / JP
02 / Murai, Atsushi, c/o Kao Corporation Res. Lab.
2606 Akabane, Ichikai-machi
Haga-gun, Tochigi / JP
03 / Hamajima, Mitsugu, c/o Kao Corporation Res. Lab.
2606 Akabane, Ichikai-machi
Haga-gun, Tochigi / JP
04 / Noguchi, Jinko, c/o Kao Corporation Res. Lab.
2606 Akabane, Ichikai-machi
Haga-gun, Tochigi / JP
 [2005/38]
Former [2002/31]01 / Kusagawa, Tetsuya, Kao Corporation Res. Lab.
2606 Akabane, Ichikai-machi
Haga-gun, Tochigi / JP
02 / Murai, Atsushi, Kao Corporation Res. Lab.
2606 Akabane, Ichikai-machi
Haga-gun, Tochigi / JP
03 / Hamajima, Mitsugu, Kao Corporation Res. Lab.
2606 Akabane, Ichikai-machi
Haga-gun, Tochigi / JP
04 / Noguchi, Jinko, Kao Corporation Res. Lab.
2606 Akabane, Ichikai-machi
Haga-gun, Tochigi / JP
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2002/31]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date02001191.229.01.2002
[2002/31]
Priority number, dateJP2001001933029.01.2001         Original published format: JP 2001019330
JP2001038069313.12.2001         Original published format: JP 2001380693
[2002/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1226801
Date:31.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1226801
Date:04.06.2003
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1226801
Date:12.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/475, A61F13/15
[2003/23]
Former International [2002/31]A61F13/475
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/09]
Former [2002/31]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Absorbierender Gegenstand[2005/41]
English:Absorbent article[2002/31]
French:Article absorbant[2002/31]
Former [2002/31]Absorbierender Artikel
Examination procedure14.10.2003Examination requested  [2003/50]
11.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
23.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.07.2005Fee for grant paid
28.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0925768  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 9 - column 3, line 56 * * column 5, line 2 - column 5, line 6; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]WO9837838  (MOELNLYCKE AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 6, line 3 - page 8, line 16 * * page 10, line 28 - page 11, line 5; figures 1-3 *;
 [PX]EP1166728  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [PX] 4-6,8 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 2 * * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 48; figures 1-6; claim 1 *;
 [PX]EP1101476  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [PX] 4-6,8 * column 6, line 24 - column 7, line 48 * * column 8, line 35 - column 8, line 38; figures 1-3,6-8 *;
 [E]EP1208826  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [E] 4-6,8 * column 6, line 30 - column 6, line 51 * * column 12, line 35 - column 12, line 55; figures 2,8 *;
 [X]EP0346477  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [X] 4,5,9 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 20 * * column 7, line 31 - column 7, line 44; figures 2-10 *