Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1224899

EP1224899 - Steam mop apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.12.2003  [2003/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DERVIN INTERNATIONAL PTY.LTD.
430 Huntingdale Road Mount Waverley 3149
Victoria / AU
[N/P]
Former [2002/30]For all designated states
DERVIN INTERNATIONAL PTY.LTD.
430 Huntingdale Road
Mount Waverley 3149, Victoria / AU
Inventor(s)01 / Shaw, Robin Roger, c/oDervin International Pty.Ltd
430 Huntingdale Road
Mount Waverly 3149, Victoria / AU
 [2002/30]
Representative(s)Fleuchaus, Leo , et al
Fleuchaus & Gallo, Melchiorstrasse 42
81479 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/30]Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Fleuchaus & Gallo, Melchiorstrasse 42
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date02001338.918.01.2002
[2002/30]
Priority number, dateUS2001076582219.01.2001         Original published format: US 765822
[2002/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1224899
Date:24.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1224899
Date:11.09.2002
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:A47L11/34, A47L13/22, A47L13/26, A47L13/16
[2002/36]
Former International [2002/30]A47L11/34, A47L13/22, A47L13/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/30]
TitleGerman:Dampfreinigungswischgerät[2002/30]
English:Steam mop apparatus[2002/30]
French:Balai à vapeur[2002/30]
Examination procedure12.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/49]
04.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/49]
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9926522  (SIMAC VETRELLA SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1,4-6 * page 1, line 6 - line 10 * * page 10, line 10 - line 22 * * page 11, line 2 - line 6 * * page 13, line 9 - line 18; figures 1,2,5 *;
 [X]EP0625331  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,4 * column 3, line 13 - line 17 * * column 4, line 14 - column 5, line 15 * * column 6, line 11 - line 18 * * column 6, line 32 - line 38 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [YD]US5920952  (BALDACCI LAPO [IT]) [YD] 1-8,13-17 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 61; figure 2 *;
 [Y]US5114255  (VILLARREAL JOSE R [US]) [Y] 1-8,13-17 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 34; figure 4 *;
 [A]EP0972875  (NAOMOTO KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 5 *;
 [XY]EP1027855  (DOUSS LINE S R L [IT]) [X] 9,10 * column 2, line 26 - line 43 * * column 4, line 18 - line 50; figures 5-7 * [Y] 11,12;
 [Y]DE20015160U  (JUNGNICKEL BERND [DE]) [Y] 11,12 * page 2, line 16 - line 19 * * page 3, paragraph 2; figure - *;
 [A]US1724267  (FIELD HERBERT D) [A] 9-11 * page 1, line 19 - line 26 * * page 2, line 3 - line 11 * * page 2, line 84 - line 89; figures 1,3 *