EP1244004 - Dual-mode hand-held game controller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEGA CORPORATION 2-12, Haneda 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states SEGA CORPORATION 2-12, Haneda 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states SEGA ENTERPRISES, LTD. 2-12 Haneda 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 144 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Jay, III 348 Bentel Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90049 / US | 02 /
Curran, Kenneth J. 2829 Rikkard Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91362 / US | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02001423.9 | 06.01.1994 | [2002/39] | Priority number, date | US19930001057 | 06.01.1993 Original published format: US 1057 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1244004 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1244004 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
A63F13/213 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0338 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/843 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/219 (EP,KR);
A63F13/22 (US);
A63F13/23 (EP,KR);
A63F13/24 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/426 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/812 (EP,KR);
G06F3/0304 (EP,US);
A63F13/95 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/10 (US);
A63F2300/1006 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/1025 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/1043 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/1087 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/205 (US);
A63F2300/206 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/39] | Title | German: | Handtragbare Spielsteurung mit zwei Betriebsarten | [2002/39] | English: | Dual-mode hand-held game controller | [2002/39] | French: | Appareil portable de commande de jeu à double mode | [2002/39] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 10.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/40] | 28.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94904002.6 / EP0679986 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4121110 (SOLOMON ELIAS E) [A] 3-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 51 *; | [A]FR2416510 (ANVAR [FR]) [A] 1-10* page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 20 *; | [Y]US4591841 (GUNDERSON JON [US], et al) [Y] 3-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 20 * * column 5, line 43 - line 46 *; | [XY]US5059958 (JACOBS JORDAN S [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, line 8 - line 19 * * column 3, line 17 - line 42 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 4 * [Y] 3-10 |