Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238688

EP1238688 - Method and apparatus for managing data in a gaming system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.07.2014
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
[N/P]
Former [2013/35]For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Whitten, Jon Marcus Randall
197 241st Place SE
Sammamish, Washington 98074 / US
02 / Pirich, Christopher M.
843 NE 84th Street
Seattle, Washington 98115 / US
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Fischer, Michael Maria , et al
Olswang Germany LLP
Rosental 4
80331 München / DE
[2013/35]
Former [2011/49]Fischer, Michael Maria , et al
Olswang Gemany LLP
Maximilianstrasse 13
80539 München / DE
Former [2002/37]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02001444.521.01.2002
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateUS2001080279709.03.2001         Original published format: US 802797
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1238688
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1238688
Date:04.05.2005
[2005/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1238688
Date:28.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2005
ClassificationInternational:A63F13/10
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Datenverwaltung in einem Spielsystem[2002/37]
English:Method and apparatus for managing data in a gaming system[2002/37]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour administrer des données dans un système de jeu[2002/37]
Examination procedure23.09.2005Examination requested  [2005/47]
08.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2013Date of oral proceedings
28.02.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
08.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.2013Fee for grant paid
16.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.10.2007
Opposition(s)30.05.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
12.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
13.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
14.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
11.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
08.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.08.2013
BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
ES28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
IT28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
TR28.08.2013
GR29.11.2013
PT30.12.2013
IE21.01.2014
LU21.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2015/07]AT28.08.2013
BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
ES28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
IT28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
GR29.11.2013
PT30.12.2013
IE21.01.2014
LU21.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2014/46]AT28.08.2013
BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
ES28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
IT28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
GR29.11.2013
PT30.12.2013
LU21.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2014/41]AT28.08.2013
BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
ES28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
IT28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
GR29.11.2013
PT30.12.2013
LU21.01.2014
Former [2014/38]AT28.08.2013
BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
ES28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
IT28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
GR29.11.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/24]AT28.08.2013
BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
ES28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
IT28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
GR29.11.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/21]AT28.08.2013
BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
GR29.11.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/18]AT28.08.2013
BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
GR29.11.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/14]CY20.06.2013
AT28.08.2013
BE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
GR29.11.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY20.06.2013
AT28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
GR29.11.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/11]CY20.06.2013
AT28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/10]CY20.06.2013
AT28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/09]AT28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/08]PT30.12.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]FR2743434  (COLLET OLIVIER) [X] 1-7,10-18,43-47 * claim 3 * * page 2, lines 1-23 * * page 4, lines 1-10 * * page 5, lines 14-20,25-30 * * page 6, lines 1-8; figure 1 * * page 6, lines 2-6,19-22 * * page 7, lines 16-24 * [Y] 8-10,19-31,34,35,57-60;
 [X]EP0809214  (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK) [X] 1-4,12-16,43,46,47,57-60 * column 8, lines 26-55 *;
 [YA]EP0998966  (STD MANUFACTURING LTD) [Y] 27-31,34,35 * abstract * * column 14, lines 2-14 * * column 14, lines 41-55 * [A] 10,19-21,23,45;
 [YA]  - DANIEL QUINLAN, "Filesystem Hierarchy Standard - Version 2.0", (19971026), URL: http://www.lisoleg.net/lisoleg/fs/fhs.pdf, (20041118), XP002306615 [Y] 8-10,19-26,57-60 * the whole document * [A] 27-31,33,34,43-47
 [A]  - UNKNOWN, "Dex Drive Manual", GAMESHARK, (1998), pages 1 - 15, URL: http://www.angelfire.com/games/winospsxdexdrive/dexdrive.PDF, (20041129), XP002307899 [A] 1-60
ExaminationEP0965903