Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1228984

EP1228984 - Endless vertical conveyor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.03.2007  [2007/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NERAK GMBH FÖRDERTECHNIK
Brigitta 5
29313 Hambühren / DE
[2002/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Dettmer, Claus
Am Witte Moor 21
29313 Hambühren / DE
02 / Handrack, Bernd
Goethestrasse 12
77654 Offenburg / DE
 [2002/32]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Thömen & Körner
Postfach 59 31
30059 Hannover / DE
[2002/32]
Application number, filing date02001563.223.01.2002
[2002/32]
Priority number, dateDE200110372026.01.2001         Original published format: DE 10103720
[2002/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1228984
Date:07.08.2002
Language:DE
[2002/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1228984
Date:18.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:B65G17/12
[2002/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/32]
TitleGerman:Vertikalumlaufförderer[2002/32]
English:Endless vertical conveyor[2002/32]
French:Transporteur vertical sans fin[2002/32]
Examination procedure07.08.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/41]
30.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2003Fee for grant paid
04.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY18.06.2003
TR18.06.2003
GR18.09.2003
LU23.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
[2007/10]
Former [2006/52]TR18.06.2003
GR18.09.2003
LU23.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
Former [2005/23]GR18.09.2003
LU23.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
Former [2005/02]GR18.09.2003
MC31.01.2004
Former [2004/02]GR18.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[XY]US1250125  (BAKER GEORGE SAMUEL [GB], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, line 86 - page 2, line 2; figures 1-4 * [Y] 2,3,5;
 [Y]WO9117102  (INT TRANSPORT SYST ITS [DK]) [Y] 2 * page 4, line 7 - line 16; figures 4,6 *;
 [Y]JPS58148103  ;
 [Y]DE4238341  (FARDEX S A R L [FR]) [Y] 5 * column 3, line 54 - line 58; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5101963  (SKARLUPKA JOSEPH H [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US5207314  (UEDA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 6 * figure 1 *;
 [A]JPH0432415
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831130), vol. 007, no. 269, Database accession no. (M - 259), [Y] 3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920515), vol. 016, no. 206, Database accession no. (M - 1248), [A] 1 * abstract *