EP1256386 - Booth for spraying powder onto workpieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 10.04.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2012 | Opposition rejected | published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J. Wagner AG Industriestrasse 22 9450 Altstätten / CH | [2008/25] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states J. Wagner AG Industriestrasse 22 9450 Altstätten / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keller, Christoph Untere Rebrainstrasse 2a 9213 Hauptwil / CH | 02 /
Mendler, Hans Dufourpark 8 9030 Abtwil / CH | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Roland Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02001679.6 | 24.01.2002 | [2002/46] | Priority number, date | DE20012007767U | 08.05.2001 Original published format: DE 20107767 U | [2002/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1256386 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1256386 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1256386 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B05B15/12 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
B05B16/90 (EP,US);
B05B16/25 (EP,US);
B05B16/40 (EP,US);
B05B14/48 (EP,US);
Y10S118/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2008/20] |
Former [2005/39] | DE, GB, IT, SE | ||
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kabine zur Pulverbeschichtung von Werkstücken | [2002/46] | English: | Booth for spraying powder onto workpieces | [2002/46] | French: | Cabine de poudrage de pièces | [2002/46] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 13.07.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, TR | 12.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES, FR | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.03.2009
ADMISSIBLE ITW Gema GmbH Mövenstrasse 17 9015 St. Gallen / CH Opponents representative Trinks, Ole, et al, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.03.2009
ADMISSIBLE ITW Gema GmbH Mövenstrasse 17 9015 St. Gallen / CH Opponents representative Trinks, Ole, et al, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR P.O. Box 102605 Augsburg / DE | 22.04.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.06.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.10.2011 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2012/19] | 18.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.12.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.12.2011 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Designated contracting state(s) FR, ES | 31.03.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.04.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19524327 (KRAEMER ERICH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6* the whole document *; | [X]EP0839582 (GEMA VOLSTATIC AG [CH]) [X] 1-3,6 * the whole document * | Examination | DE10162033 |