Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1241062

EP1241062 - Distribution system for supplying users [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.04.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 16.06.2004  [2004/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[2002/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Panik, Ferdinand, Prof. Dr.
Mittelstrasse 5/9
73733 Esslingen / DE
 [2002/38]
Application number, filing date02001756.225.01.2002
[2002/38]
Priority number, dateDE200111290115.03.2001         Original published format: DE 10112901
[2002/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1241062
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1241062
Date:07.01.2004
[2004/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:B60S5/02, H01M8/06
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verteilersystem zur Versorgung von Verbrauchern[2002/38]
English:Distribution system for supplying users[2002/38]
French:Système de répartition pour l'alimentation des utilisateurs[2002/38]
Examination procedure01.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/05]
26.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.04.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0069773  (STUART ENERGY SYS CORP [CA]) [X] 1-7 * page 1, line 6 - line 8; figures 1,1A,1B,1C,2,3,4,7A,7B * * page 2, line 26 - line 29 * * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 3 * * page 6, line 23 - line 34 * * page 7, line 14 - line 28 * * page 11, line 6 - page 12, line 19 * * page 13, line 17 - page 15, line 28 * * page 17, line 4 - line 14 * * page 17, line 26 - line 34 * * page 19, line 19 - page 21, line 2 * * claim - *;
 [X]DE3407881  (KRIEB FRANZ KARL) [X] 1-5 * page 9, paragraph 7 - page 10, paragraph 4; figure 1 *
by applicantUS6065511