EP1239141 - Mixer housing arrangement for a combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.2005 [2005/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pierburg GmbH Alfred-Pierburg-Strasse 1 41460 Neuss / DE | [2002/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sovva, Elena Albert-Einstein-Strasse 24 47167 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
Sanders, Michael An der Linde 23 41564 Kaarst / DE | 03 /
Joepen, Hans-Georg Wildstrasse 43 41239 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | ter Smitten, Hans Pierburg GmbH Patentabteilung Alfred-Pierburg-Strasse 1 41460 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Ter Smitten, Hans Pierburg GmbH, Patentabteilung, Alfred-Pierburg Strasse 1 41460 Neuss / DE | ||
Former [2002/37] | Ter Smitten, Hans Rheinmetall AG Zentrale Patentabteilung Rheinmetall Allee 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02001759.6 | 25.01.2002 | [2002/37] | Priority number, date | DE2001111391 | 09.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10111391 | [2002/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1239141 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1239141 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/07 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
F02M35/10222 (EP);
F02M26/11 (EP);
F02M26/21 (EP);
F02D9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/22] |
Former [2002/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Mischgehäuseanordnung für eine Brennkraftmaschine | [2002/37] | English: | Mixer housing arrangement for a combustion engine | [2002/37] | French: | Aménagement d'un mélangeur pour un moteur à combustion interne | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 26.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4953518 (KILLION ROBERT F [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 5 - line 15; figures 1,2,4,5A-5D * [Y] 3; | [AY]DE4338192 (PIERBURG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 25 - line 37; figure 1 * [Y] 3; | [A]EP0900931 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0962646 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [PA]US6295975 (YEW KWANG [CA], et al) [PA] 1* figure 1 * |