Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1243357

EP1243357 - Material transport device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.01.2010
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.02.2010  [2010/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aida Engineering Co., Ltd.
2-10, Ohyama-cho Sagamihara-shi
Kanagawa 229-1181 / JP
[2009/11]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
Aida Engineering Co., Ltd.
2-10, Ohyama-cho
Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-1181 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Arai, Toshihiko
c/o Aida Engineering Co., Ltd., 2-10 Ohyama-Cho
Sagimihara-Shi, Kanagawa 229-1181 / JP
02 / Maeda, Nobuyoshi
c/o Aida Engineering Co., Ltd., 2-10 Ohyama-Cho
Sagimihara-Shi, Kanagawa 229-1181 / JP
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/33]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2002/39]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date02001791.925.01.2002
[2002/39]
Priority number, dateJP2001007784619.03.2001         Original published format: JP 2001077846
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1243357
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1243357
Date:28.04.2004
[2004/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1243357
Date:11.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:B21D43/18, B65G15/58, B65G21/20, B65G47/92
[2004/18]
Former International [2002/39]B21D43/12, B21D43/18
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   IT,   LI [2005/03]
Former [2002/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Materialtransportvorrichtung[2002/39]
English:Material transport device[2002/39]
French:Dispositif de transport pour matériau[2002/39]
Examination procedure04.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/41]
08.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.2009Fee for grant paid
23.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.12.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
05.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
23.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
07.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]US4912959  (BOND IRVIN D [US]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19544490  (SCHULER PRESSEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE9012050U  (SIEMENS);
 [A]DE29915611U  (NSM MAGNETTECH GMBH & CO KG [DE])