Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1226784

EP1226784 - Vital signs detection system and health control method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/31]Vital signs detection system
[2006/41]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2008
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2007/15]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2002/31]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Mori, Yasuhiro
2-3-5-403, Wakecho
Izumi-shi, Osaka 594-007 / JP
 [2002/31]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/31]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02001799.225.01.2002
[2002/31]
Priority number, dateJP2001001704625.01.2001         Original published format: JP 2001017046
[2002/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1226784
Date:31.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1226784
Date:11.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00, A61B5/0205, A61B5/22
[2002/31]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/17]
Former [2002/31]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:System zur Erfassung von Lebenszeichen und Verfahren zur Gesundheitskontrolle[2006/41]
English:Vital signs detection system and health control method[2006/41]
French:Système de détection de signaux vitaux et méthode de contrôle de santé[2006/41]
Former [2002/31]System zur Erfassung von Lebenszeichen
Former [2002/31]Vital signs detection system
Former [2002/31]Système de détection de signaux vitaux
Examination procedure30.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/40]
02.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.2007Fee for grant paid
22.02.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.01.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
30.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No Search