blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1229190

EP1229190 - Door handle for a vehicle door [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.01.2006
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.03.2006  [2006/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valeo Sicherheitssysteme GmbH
Waldstrasse 2
85253 Erdweg / DE
[2002/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Schwab, Dittmar
Goethestrasse 21
63110 Rodgau / DE
 [2002/32]
Representative(s)Rosolen-Delarue, Katell
Valeo Securité Habitacle
Service Propriété Industrielle
42 Rue Le Corbusier
Europarc
94042 Créteil Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2004/40]Rosolen-Delarue, Katell
Valeo Securité Habitacle, Service Propriété Industrielle, 42, rue Le Corbusier - Europarc
94042 Creteil Cedex / FR
Former [2003/49]Hervouet, Sylvie, et al
Valeo Sécurité Habitacle S.A.S. Service Propriété Industrielle 42, rue Le Corbusier Europarc
94042 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2002/32]Croonenbroek, Thomas
Valeo Securité Habitacle, 42, rue Le Corbusier, Europarc
94042 Créteil Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date02001859.428.01.2002
[2002/32]
Priority number, dateDE200110447331.01.2001         Original published format: DE 10104473
[2002/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1229190
Date:07.08.2002
Language:DE
[2002/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1229190
Date:10.12.2003
[2003/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2003
ClassificationIPC:E05B1/00
[2002/32]
CPC:
E05B85/16 (EP); E05B79/06 (EP); E05B85/10 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/36]
Former [2002/32]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Türgriff für eine Fahrzeugtür[2002/32]
English:Door handle for a vehicle door[2002/32]
French:Poignée pour une porte de véhicule[2002/32]
Examination procedure11.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/33]
20.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/09]
07.09.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5651163  (TAMAKI YASUYUKI [JP]) [Y] 3,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19724572  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *;
 [XY]DE19813316  (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,7,9 * the whole document * [Y] 3,8;
 [A]EP1026351  (VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE [FR]) [A] 1* figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19929022  (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 32; figure 1 *
ExaminationWO0212663
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.