blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1340449

EP1340449 - Shoe scraper [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2006
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.12.2006  [2006/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEGGUS EMS GMBH
HÖHEFELDSTRASSE 56-60
76356 WEINGARTEN / DE
[2003/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Geggus, Kai
Höhefeldstrasse 56-60
76356 Weingarten / DE
 [2003/36]
Representative(s)Thews, Karl, et al
STT Sozietät Thews & Thews
Patentanwälte
Augustaanlage 32
68165 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/02]Thews, Karl, et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Sartorius - Thews & Thews Helmholtzstrasse 35
68723 Schwetzingen / DE
Former [2003/36]Sartorius, Peter, Dipl.-Ing.
Sartorius - Thews & Thews Postfach 18 73
68708 Schwetzingen / DE
Application number, filing date02002512.802.02.2002
[2003/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1340449
Date:03.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1340449
Date:04.01.2006
Language:DE
[2006/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2002
ClassificationIPC:A47L23/26
[2003/36]
CPC:
A47L23/26 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   LI [2004/22]
Former [2003/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fussabstreifer[2003/36]
English:Shoe scraper[2003/36]
French:Décrottoir[2003/36]
Examination procedure01.10.2002Examination requested  [2003/36]
20.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
29.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2005Fee for grant paid
06.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]US3808628  (BETTS K) [X] 1-5,8-11,13-16 * abstract * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 35 * * column 6, line 22 - line 28 * * column 8, line 3 - line 36 * * figures 1,2,7,14,15 * [Y] 6,7;
 [AY]DE4407231  (GEGGUS EMS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,11-13 * abstract * * figure - * [Y] 6,7;
 [A]EP0676169  (ARENS ERICH [DE]) [A] 1,11-13 * figure 4 *;
 [AD]DE4407231  (GEGGUS EMS GMBH [DE])[AD] 1,11-13
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.