Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260680

EP1260680 - Hydraulic valve drive for 2 valves simultaneously in a diesel engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2007
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Caterpillar Motoren GmbH & Co. KG
Falckensteiner Strasse 2
24159 Kiel / DE
[2002/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Schacht, Hans-Jürgen
Fischerstrasse 10
24214 Gettorf / DE
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Klang, Alexander H.
Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[2006/17]
Former [2002/48]Hansmann, Dierk, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4
22767 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date02002524.304.02.2002
[2002/48]
Priority number, dateDE200112486922.05.2001         Original published format: DE 10124869
[2002/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1260680
Date:27.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1260680
Date:02.05.2003
[2003/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1260680
Date:05.04.2006
Language:DE
[2006/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:F01L9/02, F01L1/26
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
TitleGerman:Hydraulische Steuereinrichtung für gleiche Ventile eines Dieselmotors[2002/48]
English:Hydraulic valve drive for 2 valves simultaneously in a diesel engine[2002/48]
French:Dispositif d'actionnement de 2 soupapes simultanément dans un moteur diesel[2002/48]
Examination procedure21.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/21]
30.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.12.2005Fee for grant paid
03.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
06.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200403   M06   Fee paid on   03.04.2004
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY05.04.2006
FR05.04.2006
GB05.04.2006
IE05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
TR05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
GR06.07.2006
ES16.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]CY05.04.2006
FR05.04.2006
GB05.04.2006
IE05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
GR06.07.2006
ES16.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
Former [2009/01]FR05.04.2006
GB05.04.2006
IE05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
GR06.07.2006
ES16.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
Former [2008/20]GB05.04.2006
IE05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
GR06.07.2006
ES16.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
Former [2008/04]GB05.04.2006
IE05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
ES16.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
Former [2007/37]GB05.04.2006
IE05.04.2006
IT05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
ES16.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
Former [2007/27]GB05.04.2006
IE05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
ES16.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
Former [2007/19]IE05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
ES16.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
Former [2007/12]IE05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
ES16.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
Former [2007/10]DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
ES16.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
Former [2006/50]SE05.07.2006
ES16.07.2006
Former [2006/48]SE05.07.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH1130135  ;
 [A]EP0767295  (NEW SULZER DIESEL AG [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6173685  (STURMAN ODED E [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 18 * * figure - *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantDE19716042
 WO9301399