Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257049

EP1257049 - Control apparatus for alternating-current source [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.11.2007
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.12.2007  [2007/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8010 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/52]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8010 / JP
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakatsugawa, Junnosuke
20-3, Ayukawa-cho 6-chome
Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316-0036 / JP
02 / Endo, Tsunehiro
1349-14, Arajuku-cho
Hitachiota-shi, Ibaraki 313-0007 / JP
03 / Inaba, Hiromi
820-9, Ichige
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0033 / JP
04 / Iwaji, Yoshitaka
2-3-102, Minamikoya-cho 2-chome
Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-1224 / JP
05 / Kawabata, Yukio
Sankuresuto 103, 1564-2, Higashiishikawa
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0052 / JP
06 / Tomita, Hiroyuki
8-48-1-304, Narashinodai
Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274-0063 / JP
07 / Kato, Junji
5-1-16, Nishitoriishi
Takaishi-shi, Osaka 592-0012 / JP
 [2006/52]
Former [2002/46]01 / Nakatsugawa, Junnosuke
20-3, Ayukawa-cho 6-chome
Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316-0036 / JP
02 / Endo, Tsunehiro
1349-14, Arajuku-cho
Hitachiota-shi, Ibaraki 313-0007 / JP
03 / Inaba, Hiromi
820-9, Ichige
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0033 / JP
04 / Iwaji, Yoshitaka
2-3-102, Minamikoya-cho 2-chome
Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-1224 / JP
05 / Kawabata, Yukio
Sankuresuto 103, 1564-2, Higashiishikawa
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0052 / JP
06 / Tomita, Hiroyuki
8-48-1-304, Narashidonai
Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274-0063 / JP
07 / Kato, Junji
5-1-16, Nishitoriishi
Takaishi-shi, Osaka 592-0012 / JP
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[2002/46]
Application number, filing date02002878.308.02.2002
[2002/46]
Priority number, dateJP2001013807509.05.2001         Original published format: JP 2001138075
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1257049
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1257049
Date:10.12.2003
[2003/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1257049
Date:27.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:H02P23/00
[2006/06]
Former International [2002/46]H02P7/62
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/36]
Former [2002/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Regelvorrichtung für eine Wechselstromquelle[2002/46]
English:Control apparatus for alternating-current source[2002/46]
French:Dispositif de commande pour une source de courant alternatif[2002/46]
Examination procedure08.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/33]
05.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.03.2006Fee for grant paid
31.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
Opposition(s)28.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0788778  (KALTENBACH & VOIGT [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 39 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0844730  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 6 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]JP2001112293  ;
 [X]JPH099698  ;
 [A]JP2001352800  ;
 [A]JP2001103798  ;
 [AD]JPH06265607  ;
 [AD]JPH06315291  ;
 [AD]JPH07244099
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010803), vol. 2000, no. 21, [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 1997, no. 05, [X] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020804), vol. 2002, no. 04, [A] 1,2,4,5,7 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010803), vol. 2000, no. 21, [A] 1,2,4,5,7 * abstract *
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941216), vol. 018, no. 670, Database accession no. (P - 1845), [AD] 1,2 * abstract *
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950331), vol. 1995, no. 02, [AD] 1,4,5,7 * abstract *
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960131), vol. 1996, no. 01, [AD] 1,4,5,7 * abstract *