Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238909

EP1238909 - Apparatus for longitudinally strapping an article with a strapping band [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.07.2004
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schmetzer, Helmut
Almstrasse 5
D-95448 Bayreuth / DE
[2002/37]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Matschkur, Lindner, Blaumeier
Postfach 11 91 09
90101 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Matschkur, Lindner, Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 11 91 09
90101 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date02003025.012.02.2002
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateDE200111139509.03.2001         Original published format: DE 10111395
[2002/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1238909
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1238909
Date:24.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:B65B13/06, B65B27/08
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Längsumreifen eines Gegenstandes mit einem Umreifungsband[2002/37]
English:Apparatus for longitudinally strapping an article with a strapping band[2002/37]
French:Dispositif pour cercler longitudinalement un objet avec une bande de cerclage[2002/37]
Examination procedure14.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
17.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.2003Fee for grant paid
26.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY24.09.2003
FI24.09.2003
IE24.09.2003
TR24.09.2003
GR24.12.2003
AT12.02.2004
LU12.02.2004
PT24.02.2004
BE28.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/10]CY24.09.2003
FI24.09.2003
IE24.09.2003
TR24.09.2003
GR24.12.2003
AT12.02.2004
LU12.02.2004
BE28.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
Former [2006/52]FI24.09.2003
IE24.09.2003
TR24.09.2003
GR24.12.2003
AT12.02.2004
LU12.02.2004
BE28.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
Former [2005/36]FI24.09.2003
IE24.09.2003
GR24.12.2003
AT12.02.2004
LU12.02.2004
BE28.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
Former [2005/23]FI24.09.2003
IE24.09.2003
GR24.12.2003
LU12.02.2004
BE28.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
Former [2005/14]FI24.09.2003
IE24.09.2003
GR24.12.2003
BE28.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
Former [2005/02]FI24.09.2003
IE24.09.2003
GR24.12.2003
MC28.02.2004
Former [2004/29]FI24.09.2003
IE24.09.2003
GR24.12.2003
Former [2004/14]FI24.09.2003
GR24.12.2003
Former [2004/12]FI24.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE19632728  (SCHNEIDER & OZGA [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5373686  (LANG GEORG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 48-65; figure 3 *;
 [PA]DE10010275  (SCHNEIDER & OZGA [DE]) [PA] 1 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 19; figures 3,4 *;
 [PA]DE10064781  (SCHNEIDER & OZGA [DE]) [PA] 1 * figure 4 *
by applicantDE19632728
 EP0905025
 DE4024149
 DE20007232U