Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238999

EP1238999 - Porous hydrophilic membranes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  22.08.2008
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2012Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 06.06.2012  [2012/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solvay Solexis S.p.A.
Via Turati, 12
20121 Milano / IT
[2006/17]
Former [2003/14]For all designated states
Solvay Solexis S.p.A.
Via Turati, 12
20121 Milano / IT
Former [2003/13]For all designated states
AGORA' S.p.A.
Via Turati, 12
20121 Milano / IT
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
Ausimont S.p.A.
Piazzetta Maurilio Bossi 3
20121 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Arcella, Vincenzo
Via Giovanni XXIII, 21
20014 Nerviano, Milano / IT
02 / Ghielmi, Alessandro
Via Marcantonio Colonna 43
20149 Milano / IT
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Jacques, Philippe , et al
Solvay S.A.
Département de la Propriété Industrielle
Rue de Ransbeek, 310
1120 Bruxelles / BE
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Jacques, Philippe , et al
Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle, Rue de Ransbeek, 310
1120 Bruxelles / BE
Former [2007/15]Jacques, Philippe , et al
Solvay S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 310, rue de Ransbeek
B-1120 Bruxelles / BE
Former [2002/37]Sama, Daniele, Dr. , et al
Sama Patents, Via G.B. Morgagni, 2
20129 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date02003033.412.02.2002
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateIT2001MI0038326.02.2001         Original published format: IT MI010383
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1238999
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1238999
Date:26.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:C08J5/22, B01D71/36
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2003/22]
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Poröse hydrophile Membranen[2002/37]
English:Porous hydrophilic membranes[2002/37]
French:Membranes poreuses hydrophiles[2002/37]
Examination procedure25.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/17]
07.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2005Fee for grant paid
22.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.01.2007  14.02.2007  ADMISSIBLE
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Opponent's representative
Hansen, Jesper Römer
DSM Intellectual Property
P.O. Box 4
6100 AA Echt / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2009/38]
Opponent(s)01  26.01.2007  14.02.2007  ADMISSIBLE
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Opponent's representative
Hansen, Jesper Römer
DSM Intellectual Property DSM IP Assets B.V. Galeen Office P.O. Box 9
NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL
Former [2007/10]
Opponent(s)01  26.01.2007   
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Opponent's representative
Hansen, Jesper Römer
DSM Intellectual Property DSM IP Assets B.V. Galeen Office P.O. Box 9
NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL
09.03.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.07.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.04.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.04.2008
17.04.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.04.2008Date of oral proceedings
09.05.2008Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
19.05.2008Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2008/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE26.07.2006
[2012/23]
Former [2009/37]SE26.07.2006
IT12.02.2008
Former [2009/01]SE26.07.2006
Former [2007/37]IT26.04.2006
SE26.07.2006
Former [2006/48]SE26.07.2006
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9740924  (GORE & ASS [US]) [Y] 1-25 * page 14, line 21 - page 15, line 10 * * page 18, line 6 - line 20 * * claims 1-10 *;
 [Y]WO0061267  (PALL CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * claims 1-47 *;
 [A]US5635041  (BAHAR BAMDAD [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * column 8, line 33 - line 50; examples 1,5 *;
 [A]US5447636  (BANERJEE SHOIBAL [US]) [A] 1-25 * column W *;
 [A]US4954388  (MALLOUK ROBERT S [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * column W *