Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238765

EP1238765 - Pre-stressed cutting tool and cutting device including such a cutting tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.09.2010
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aichele Werkzeuge GmbH
Zur Flügelau 40
74564 Crailsheim / DE
[2002/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Aichele, Wilhelm
Mozartstrasse 12
74564 Crailsheim / DE
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Regelmann, Thomas
HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14 c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Regelmann, Thomas, Dr.
Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner, Uhlandstrasse 14 c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date02003100.113.02.2002
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateDE200110993321.02.2001         Original published format: DE 10109933
[2002/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1238765
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1238765
Date:12.05.2004
[2004/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1238765
Date:28.10.2009
Language:DE
[2009/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:B26D7/08, B26D7/26, B26F1/38
[2004/20]
Former International [2002/37]B26D7/26, B26D7/08, B26F1/38
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
TitleGerman:Vorgespanntes Schneidwerkzeug, sowie Schneidvorrichtung umfassend ein solches Schneidwerkzeug[2002/37]
English:Pre-stressed cutting tool and cutting device including such a cutting tool[2002/37]
French:Outil de coupe précontraint ainsi que dispositif de coupe ayant un tel outil[2002/37]
Examination procedure11.11.2004Examination requested  [2005/02]
22.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.2006Date of oral proceedings
23.03.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
23.03.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
15.04.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.07.2009
12.05.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2009Date of oral proceedings
03.07.2009Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
15.08.2009Fee for grant paid
15.08.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination19.05.2006Appeal received No.  T1378/06
27.07.2006Statement of grounds filed
14.08.2008Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
11.06.2008Date of oral proceedings
Opposition(s)29.07.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
24.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
23.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
20.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
IE28.10.2009
NL28.10.2009
TR28.10.2009
GR29.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
AT13.02.2010
LU13.02.2010
BE28.02.2010
CH28.02.2010
LI28.02.2010
MC01.03.2010
PT01.03.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]CY28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
IE28.10.2009
NL28.10.2009
GR29.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
AT13.02.2010
LU13.02.2010
BE28.02.2010
CH28.02.2010
LI28.02.2010
MC01.03.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2012/43]CY28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
IE28.10.2009
GR29.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
AT13.02.2010
LU13.02.2010
BE28.02.2010
CH28.02.2010
LI28.02.2010
MC01.03.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2011/31]CY28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
IE28.10.2009
GR29.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
AT13.02.2010
BE28.02.2010
CH28.02.2010
LI28.02.2010
MC01.03.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2011/14]CY28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
IE28.10.2009
GR29.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
BE28.02.2010
CH28.02.2010
LI28.02.2010
MC01.03.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/47]CY28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
IE28.10.2009
GR29.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
CH28.02.2010
LI28.02.2010
MC01.03.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/46]CY28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
IE28.10.2009
GR29.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
MC01.03.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/35]CY28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
IE28.10.2009
ES08.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/25]CY28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
ES08.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/22]FI28.10.2009
ES08.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/19]ES08.02.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0947717  (FAMECCANICA DATA SPA [IT]) [X] 1,3-18,20-35 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4756219  (POHL WALTER [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,18,19 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4485710  (SCHLISIO SIEGFRIED [DE], et al) [X] 1,18 * column 10, line 60 - line 63 *;
 [X]US4607831  (RAYBUCK WILLIAM B [US]) [X] 1,18 * column 10, line 16 *;
 [DA]DE19834104  (AICHELE WERKZEUGE GMBH & CO KG [DE]);
 [DA]DE3124053  (RAMM K H SPEZIALFAB [DE])
ExaminationUS2224668