Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238919

EP1238919 - Closure device for preventing the refilling of a bottle with a collar sleeve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medvedev, Zinovy Grigorievich
ul. Chertavovskaya, d. 33, korp. 1, kv. 148
Moscow 113519 / RU
For all designated states
Medvedev, Oleg Zinovievich
ul. Chertanovskaya, d. 33, korp. 1, kv. 148
Moscow 113519 Moscow / RU
[2003/17]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
Obschestvo S ogranichennoi otvetstvennostju, " Zavod upakovochnykh izdely TOKK"
Ramensky raion, pos. Bykovo, ul. Verkhnaya, d. 30
140150 Moskovskaya obl. / RU
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2003/49]
Former [2002/37]01 / Medvedev, Zinovy Grigorievich
ul.Chertanovskaya,d.33,korp.1,kv.148
113519 Moskow / RU
02 / Medvedev, Oleg Zinovievich
ul.Chertanovskaya,d.33,korp.,1,kv.148
113519 Moscow / RU
Representative(s)Zellentin & Partner mbB Patentanwälte
Nigerstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner
Zweibrückenstrasse 15
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date02003150.614.02.2002
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateRU2001010550001.03.2001         Original published format: RU 2001105500
[2002/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1238919
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1238919
Date:14.01.2004
Language:DE
[2004/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:B65D49/04
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
TitleGerman:Verschlusssystem zur Verhütung der abermaligen Füllung einer Flasche mit Bund am Hals[2002/37]
English:Closure device for preventing the refilling of a bottle with a collar sleeve[2002/37]
French:Système de fermeture pour empêcher le reremplissage d'une bouteille avec manchon au col[2002/37]
Examination procedure29.08.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/07]
11.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2003Fee for grant paid
15.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY14.01.2004
FI14.01.2004
FR14.01.2004
GB14.01.2004
IE14.01.2004
IT14.01.2004
NL14.01.2004
TR14.01.2004
AT14.02.2004
LU14.02.2004
BE28.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
DK14.04.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
ES25.04.2004
PT14.06.2004
DE01.09.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/37]CY14.01.2004
FI14.01.2004
FR14.01.2004
GB14.01.2004
IE14.01.2004
IT14.01.2004
NL14.01.2004
TR14.01.2004
AT14.02.2004
LU14.02.2004
BE28.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
DK14.04.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
ES25.04.2004
DE01.09.2004
Former [2007/10]CY14.01.2004
FI14.01.2004
FR14.01.2004
GB14.01.2004
IE14.01.2004
NL14.01.2004
TR14.01.2004
AT14.02.2004
LU14.02.2004
BE28.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
DK14.04.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
ES25.04.2004
DE01.09.2004
Former [2006/52]FI14.01.2004
FR14.01.2004
GB14.01.2004
IE14.01.2004
NL14.01.2004
TR14.01.2004
AT14.02.2004
LU14.02.2004
BE28.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
DK14.04.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
ES25.04.2004
DE01.09.2004
Former [2006/14]FI14.01.2004
FR14.01.2004
GB14.01.2004
IE14.01.2004
NL14.01.2004
AT14.02.2004
LU14.02.2004
BE28.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
DK14.04.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
ES25.04.2004
DE01.09.2004
Former [2006/12]FI14.01.2004
GB14.01.2004
IE14.01.2004
NL14.01.2004
AT14.02.2004
LU14.02.2004
BE28.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
DK14.04.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
ES25.04.2004
DE01.09.2004
Former [2005/36]FI14.01.2004
GB14.01.2004
IE14.01.2004
AT14.02.2004
LU14.02.2004
BE28.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
DK14.04.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
ES25.04.2004
DE01.09.2004
Former [2005/23]FI14.01.2004
GB14.01.2004
IE14.01.2004
LU14.02.2004
BE28.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
DK14.04.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
ES25.04.2004
DE01.09.2004
Former [2005/14]FI14.01.2004
GB14.01.2004
IE14.01.2004
BE28.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
DK14.04.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
ES25.04.2004
DE01.09.2004
Former [2005/03]FI14.01.2004
GB14.01.2004
IE14.01.2004
MC28.02.2004
DK14.04.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
ES25.04.2004
Former [2005/02]FI14.01.2004
GB14.01.2004
MC28.02.2004
DK14.04.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
ES25.04.2004
Former [2004/46]FI14.01.2004
GB14.01.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
ES25.04.2004
Former [2004/45]FI14.01.2004
GB14.01.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
Former [2004/41]FI14.01.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
Former [2004/40]FI14.01.2004
SE14.04.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2302867  (GUALA SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [D]RU2150417  (GUALA KLOZURES S P A [IT]);
 [DA]WO9623704  (GRUPO STEVI S A DE C V [MX]) [DA] 1 * figure - *;
 [DA]GB2099394  (GUALA ANGELO SPA) [DA] 1 * figure - *;
 [DA]GB2219570  (GRUPO STEVI SA [MX]) [DA] * figure - *