Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1239004

EP1239004 - Articles for dynamic load applications [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.09.2006
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lanxess Inc.
1265 Vidal Street South
Sarnia, Ontario N7T 7M2 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2005/45]For all designated states
Lanxess Inc.
1265 Vidal Street South Sarnia
Ontario N7T 7M2 / CA
Former [2005/30]For all designated states
Lanxess Inc.
1265 Vidal Street South
Sarnia, Ontario N7T 7M2 / CA
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
Bayer Inc.
1265 Vidal Street South
Sarnia, ON N7T 7M2 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Hannay, Judy
1501 160 George Street
Sarnia, Ontario N7T 7V4 / CA
02 / Bender, Harald
Am Brölskamp 8a
50259 Pulheim / DE
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Zobel, Manfred , et al
LANXESS Deutschland GmbH
LIP IPR
51369 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Zobel, Manfred , et al
LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LIP IPR
51369 Leverkusen / DE
Former [2005/30]Zobel, Manfred, Dr. , et al
LANXESS Deutschland GmbH, LIP-IPR Building Q 18
51369 Leverkusen / DE
Former [2004/01]Schneider, Jürgen M.
Bayer AG Konzernbereich Recht, Patente und Lizenzen
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Former [2002/37]Bailly, Peter
Bayer AG, Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen
D-51368 Leverkusen / DE
Application number, filing date02003165.415.02.2002
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateCA2001233890028.02.2001         Original published format: CA 2338900
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1239004
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1239004
Date:09.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:C08K3/00, C08K5/098, C08F110/00, C08F10/00, C08F210/00, C08L23/00
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2003/22]
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Dynamisch belastbare Artikel[2002/37]
English:Articles for dynamic load applications[2002/37]
French:Article résistant au charge dynamique[2002/37]
Examination procedure11.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/19]
07.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.2005Fee for grant paid
08.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/45]
Former [2007/37]IT09.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP1081188  (BAYER INC [CA]) [PX] 1-10 * page 1, line 30 - page 1, line 40; example -; claim 1 * * page 2, line 23 - page 2, line 35 * * page 5, line 30 - page 5, line 36 *;
 [X]US5610217  (YARNELL LARRY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-11 * column 3; example -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0940429  (BAYER INC [CA]) [A] 1-10 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]US5783640  (SANDSTROM PAUL HARRY [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * example -; claim -; table - *