Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1237052

EP1237052 - Electrographic image developing process with optimized developer mass velocity [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.01.2007
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2004/37]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Eck, Edward M.
3131 Lavonia Center Road
Lima, NY 14485 / US
02 / Guth, Joseph Edward
4616 Bennits Corners
Holley, NY 14470 / US
03 / Mutze, Ulrich, Dr.
Am Bahndamm 22/1
73342 Bad Dietzenbach / DE
04 / Regelsberger, Matthias H.
19 Jonathan Drive
Rochester, New York 14612 / US
05 / Stelter, Eric C.
10 Oak Meadow Trail
Pittsford, NY 14534 / US
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited
Patent Department (W160-G)
Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex
HA1 4TY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/40]Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Former [2002/36]Franzen, Peter , et al
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG, Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Application number, filing date02003200.919.02.2002
[2002/36]
Priority number, dateUS20010287583P28.02.2001         Original published format: US 287583 P
US20010277876P22.03.2001         Original published format: US 277876 P
US2001085598515.05.2001         Original published format: US 855985
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1237052
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1237052
Date:10.05.2006
[2006/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2006
ClassificationInternational:G03G15/09, G03G13/09
[2002/36]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2007/03]
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Elektrographische Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung mit optimierter Entwicklermengen-Geschwindigkeit[2002/36]
English:Electrographic image developing process with optimized developer mass velocity[2002/36]
French:Dispositif de formation d'images électrographiques avec vélocité de masse de développeur optimisée[2002/36]
Examination procedure29.08.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/09]
10.10.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200605   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5024181  (SHOJI HISASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-11,21-38 * figures 1,14 * * columns 34-35; example 8; table 14 * * the whole document * [A] 12-20;
 [XD]US4546060  (MISKINIS EDWARD T [US], et al) [XD] 1-4 * column 12; example 4 *;
 [X]US5064739  (ASANAE MASUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * figure 1 * * column 5, lines 23-43 *
 [X]  ANZAI M ET AL, "AN IMPROVED TONER FLOW MODEL FOR DUAL-COMPONENT MAGNETIC BRUSH DEVELOPMENT", JOURNAL OF IMAGING SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, SOCIETY OF IMAGING SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, SPRINGFIELD, VA, US, (199607), vol. 40, no. 4, ISSN 1062-3701, pages 354 - 358, XP000631059 [X] 1-11 * pages 356-357 * * figures 3-7 *