Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238617

EP1238617 - Spice mill, salt mill and the like with means for preventing soiling of the supporting surface [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.12.2004
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.02.2005  [2005/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Girardini, Giancarlo
Via Novara, 30
I-28019 Suno (Novara) / IT
[2002/37]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date02003228.020.02.2002
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateIT2001MI0045205.03.2001         Original published format: IT MI010452
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1238617
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1238617
Date:04.06.2003
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A47J42/04, A47J42/38
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
TitleGerman:Gewürzmühle, Salzmühle und dergleichen mit Vorrichtung zur Verhinderung der Verschmutzung der Tragfläche[2004/06]
English:Spice mill, salt mill and the like with means for preventing soiling of the supporting surface[2002/37]
French:Moulin à épices, moulin à sel ou autre avec un dispositif pour éviter de salir la surface portante[2004/06]
Former [2002/37]Gewürzmühle, Salzmühle und dergleichen mit Vorrichtung zur Verhinderung vom Verschmutzung der Tragfläche
Former [2002/37]Moulin à épices, moulin à sel ou autre avec un dispositif pour éviter de salir le surface supportant
Examination procedure27.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/05]
29.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/06]
10.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19514794  (GASS PETER [DE]) [A] 1,3 * column 4, lines 13-45; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5722606  (WU HUA-TE [TW]) [A] 1,3 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 49; figure 5 *;
 [A]US5007592  (PONCY GEORGE W [US]) [A] 1,3 * column 2, line 59 - column 6, line 17; figure - *;
 [A]GB2352411  (CHENG SHUN I [TW]) [A] 1 * page 3 - page 4; figure - *
by applicantIT1000452