Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1243654

EP1243654 - Precursor polypeptides of phytosulfokine derived from Arabidopsis thaliana and cDNAs encoding said polypeptides [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.01.2006
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.01.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.03.2006  [2006/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NAGOYA UNIVERSITY
Furo-cho, Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi
Aichi Pref. 464 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
NAGOYA UNIVERSITY
Furo-cho, Chikusa-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi Pref. 464 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sakagami, Yoji
8-36, 1-9-11, Kitachikusa, Chikusa-ku
Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP
02 / Matsubayashi, Yoshikatsu
A102, 4-8, Ootanimachi, Moriyama-ku
Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP
03 / Yang, Heping
104-205, 1, Chiyogaoka, Chikusa-ku
Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Wibbelmann, Jobst
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date02003238.920.02.2002
[2002/39]
Priority number, dateJP2001005294627.02.2001         Original published format: JP 2001052946
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1243654
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/29, C07K14/415, C12N15/82, C12N5/10
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesFR [2003/24]
Former [2002/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Phytosulfokin-Vorläuferpolypeptide aus Arabidopsis thaliana und für diese Polypeptide kodierenden cDNAs[2002/39]
English:Precursor polypeptides of phytosulfokine derived from Arabidopsis thaliana and cDNAs encoding said polypeptides[2002/39]
French:Polypeptides precurseurs de phytosulfokine dérivés de l'Arabidopsis thaliana et ADNc codant pour ces proteines[2002/39]
Examination procedure20.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
09.08.2002New documents discovered [2002/39]
11.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.09.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/11]
10.10.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200504   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1033405  (CERES INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,10 * see SEQ ID NOs:2347, 75232, 76866 and 2345 *;
 [X]FR2791347  (UNIV NAGOYA [JP]) [X] 1-12 * page 10; figure 11 *;
 [X]  - NEWMAN T ET AL, "GENES GALORE: A SUMMARY OF METHODS FOR ACCESSING RESULTS FROM LARGE-SCALE PARTIAL SEQUENCING OF ANONYMOUS ARABIDOPSIS CDNA CLONES", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 106, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 1241 - 1255, XP000571449 [X] 1,2,4,7,8,10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.106.4.1241
    [] - DATABASE EMBL, (19950204), Database accession no. T43923, XP002202738 [ ] * abstract *
    [] - DATABASE EMBL, (19950502), Database accession no. AA395590, XP002202739 [ ] * abstract *
 [X]  - CHEN J ET AL, "Arabidopsis thaliana gene expression microarray", DATABASE EMBL, (19990909), Database accession no. AI996446, XP002201669 [X] 1,2,4 * abstract *
 [X]  - ROUNSLEY S. D. ET AL, DATABASE EMBL, (19980604), Database accession no. AC004786, XP002201670 [X] 1,2,4 * abstract *
 [Y]  - YANG HEPING ET AL, "Oryza sativa PSK gene encodes a precursor of phytosulfokine-alpha, a sulfated peptide growth factor found in plants", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (19991109), vol. 96, no. 23, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 13560 - 13565, XP002175646 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.23.13560
 [Y]  - YANG H ET AL, "MOLECULAR CLONING AND CHARACTERIZATION OF OSPSK, A GENE ENCODING A PRECURSOR FOR PHYTOSULFOKINE-ALPHA, REQUIRED FOR RICE CELL PROLIFERATION", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, NIJHOFF PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, NL, (200011), vol. 44, no. 5, ISSN 0167-4412, pages 635 - 647, XP001015809 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1026576423870
 [PX]  - YANG HEPING ET AL, "Diversity of Arabidopsis genes encoding precursors for phytosulfokine, a peptide growth factor.", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (200111), vol. 127, no. 3, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 842 - 851, XP002201668 [PX] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.127.3.842