blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1234806

EP1234806 - Manufacturing method thereof of an optical fibre [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/35]Optical fibre with longitudinal holes and manufacturing method thereof
[2006/36]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.12.2007
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0041 / JP
[2007/06]
Former [2002/35]For all designated states
Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hasegawa, Takemi, Yokohama Works
Sumitomo Electric Ind.,Ltd., 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Onishi, Masashi, Yokohama Works
Sumitomo Electric Ind.,Ltd., 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
 [2007/06]
Former [2002/35]01 / Hasegawa, Takemi, Yokohama Works
Sumitomo Electic Ind.,Ltd., 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Onishi, Masashi, Yokohama Works
Sumitomo Electic Ind.,Ltd., 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/35]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date02003258.721.02.2002
[2002/35]
Priority number, dateJP2001004540921.02.2001         Original published format: JP 2001045409
[2002/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1234806
Date:28.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1234806
Date:30.06.2004
[2004/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1234806
Date:07.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.05.2004
ClassificationIPC:C03B37/012
[2004/27]
CPC:
G02B6/02328 (EP,US); C03B37/01208 (EP,US); C03B37/0122 (EP,US);
C03B37/01231 (EP,US); G02B6/02333 (EP,US); G02B6/02347 (EP,US);
G02B6/02361 (EP,US); G02B6/02366 (EP,US); G02B6/29376 (EP,US);
C03B2201/10 (EP,US); C03B2201/28 (EP,US); C03B2201/31 (EP,US);
C03B2201/42 (EP,US); C03B2203/14 (EP,US); C03B2203/42 (EP,US);
Y02P40/57 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2002/35]C03B37/012, C03C15/00, G02B6/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT [2005/12]
Former [2002/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer optischen Faser[2006/37]
English:Manufacturing method thereof of an optical fibre[2007/06]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'une fibre optique[2006/37]
Former [2002/35]Optische Faser mit länglichen Löchern und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung
Former [2002/35]Optical fibre with longitudinal holes and manufacturing method thereof
Former [2002/35]Fibre optique à trous longitudinals et procédé de sa fabrication
Examination procedure01.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/36]
02.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
04.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.11.2006Fee for grant paid
24.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0810453  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * column 7, line 43 - column 8, line 27 *;
 [AD]US5802236  (DIGIOVANNI DAVID JOHN [US], et al) [AD] 1-23 * claims 18-20 *;
 [A]WO0016141  (CORNING INC [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * claims 23,35-39 *;
 [A]WO0049436  (UNIV BATH [GB], et al) [A] 1-23* claims 37-43 *;
 [AD]  - BENNETT P J ET AL, TOWARD PRACTICAL HOLEY FIBER TECHNOLOGY: FABRICATION, SPLICING, MODELING, AND CHARACTERIZATION, OPTICS LETTERS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, US, VOL. 24, NR. 17, PAGE(S) 1203-1205, ISSN 0146-9592, XP000873620 [AD] 1-23 * the whole document *
 [A]  - WINDELER R S ET AL, SILICA-AIR MICROSTRUCTURED FIBERS: PROPERTIES AND APPLICATIONS, OFC/IOOC '99 OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE / INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTEGRATED OPTICS AND OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION. SAN DIEGO, CA, FEB. 21 - 26, 1999, OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE / INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTEGRATED OP, ISBN 0-7803-5430-3, XP000967104 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.