Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238958

EP1238958 - Dry mortar having improved processing properties [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2004
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wacker Polymer Systems GmbH & Co. KG
Johannes-Hess-Strasse 24
84489 Burghausen / DE
For all designated states
Brillux GmbH & Co. KG
Weseler Strasse 401
48163 Münster / DE
[2002/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Jodlbauer, Franz
Bahnhofstrasse 28
84533 Marktl / DE
02 / Asen, Felix
Geretsdorf 5
5122 Ach / AT
03 / Kugel, Manfred
Markenweg 2
48653 Coesfeld / DE
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Schuderer, Michael , et al
Wacker Chemie AG
Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen
Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4
81737 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Schuderer, Michael, Dr. , et al
Wacker-Chemie GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4
81737 München / DE
Application number, filing date02003262.921.02.2002
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateDE200110984101.03.2001         Original published format: DE 10109841
DE200111397822.03.2001         Original published format: DE 10113978
[2002/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1238958
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1238958
Date:22.10.2003
Language:DE
[2003/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:C04B40/00, C04B24/24, // C04B103/22
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
TitleGerman:Trockenmörtel mit verbesserten Verarbeitungseigenschaften[2002/37]
English:Dry mortar having improved processing properties[2002/37]
French:Mortier sec à maniabilité amélioré[2002/37]
Examination procedure21.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
14.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.2003Fee for grant paid
07.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.10.2003
FI22.10.2003
IE22.10.2003
IT22.10.2003
TR22.10.2003
DK22.01.2004
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
ES02.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
PT22.03.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/37]CY22.10.2003
FI22.10.2003
IE22.10.2003
IT22.10.2003
TR22.10.2003
DK22.01.2004
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
ES02.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
Former [2007/10]CY22.10.2003
FI22.10.2003
IE22.10.2003
TR22.10.2003
DK22.01.2004
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
ES02.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
Former [2006/52]FI22.10.2003
IE22.10.2003
TR22.10.2003
DK22.01.2004
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
ES02.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
Former [2005/02]FI22.10.2003
IE22.10.2003
DK22.01.2004
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
ES02.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
Former [2004/46]FI22.10.2003
IE22.10.2003
DK22.01.2004
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
ES02.02.2004
Former [2004/41]FI22.10.2003
IE22.10.2003
DK22.01.2004
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
Former [2004/40]FI22.10.2003
IE22.10.2003
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
Former [2004/33]FI22.10.2003
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
Former [2004/26]FI22.10.2003
SE22.01.2004
Former [2004/24]SE22.01.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0894822  (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16 * claims 1,6 * * page 5, line 40 - line 43 * * page 5, line 52 - line 55 *;
 [DA]EP0338293  (KAO CORP [JP]) [DA] 1-16 * page 2, line 38 - line 43 *