Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317882

EP1317882 - Device for cooling water of an aquarium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.01.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.03.2005  [2005/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidl, Wolfgang
Moorkampstrasse 28
27755 Delmenhorst / DE
[2003/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Weidl, Wolfgang
Moorkampstr. 28
D-27755 Delmenhorst / DE
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Köchling, Conrad-Joachim , et al
Patentanwälte Köchling, Döring PartG mbB
Fleyer Strasse 135
58097 Hagen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/27]Köchling, Conrad-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Conrad Köchling, Dipl.-Ing. Conrad-Joachim Köchling Fleyer Strasse 135
58097 Hagen / DE
Former [2003/24]Köchling, Conrad, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Conrad Köchling Dipl.-Ing. Conrad-Joachim Köchling Fleyer Strasse 135
58097 Hagen / DE
Application number, filing date02003506.915.02.2002
[2003/24]
Priority number, dateDE2001219832U06.12.2001         Original published format: DE 20119832 U
[2003/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1317882
Date:11.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1317882
Date:07.01.2004
[2004/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:A01K63/06
[2003/24]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/40]
Former [2003/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Abkühlung des Wassers von Aquarien[2003/24]
English:Device for cooling water of an aquarium[2003/24]
French:Dispositif de refroidissement de l'eau d'aquarium[2003/24]
Examination procedure01.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/11]
07.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/11]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
17.08.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
17.08.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200403   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2440338  (VERNET JACQUES) [X] 1-3,5 * page 1, line 36 - page 2, line 13 * * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 4 * * page 4, lines 12-20 * * figure 1; claims 2-4 *;
 [X]JP2000083511  ;
 [A]JPH10178967
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000922), vol. 2000, no. 06, [X] 1,3,5 * abstract * * figures 1-5 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 5 *