Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236496

EP1236496 - Process and adsorbent for gas drying [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UOP LLC
25 East Algonquin Road
Des Plaines, IL 60017 / US
[2002/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Kanazirev, Vladislav Ivanov
931 North Kennicott Avenue
Arlington Heights, Illinois 60004 / US
02 / Cohen, Alan Philip
1880 Cavell Avenue
Highland Park, Illinois 60035 / US
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Weber, Dieter , et al
Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Taunusstrasse 5a
65183 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Weber, Dieter, Dr. , et al
Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Taunusstrasse 5a
65183 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date02003959.022.02.2002
[2002/36]
Priority number, dateUS2001079621828.02.2001         Original published format: US 796218
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1236496
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1236496
Date:17.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/26, B01D53/04, B01J20/32, B01J20/10, B01D53/047, B60T17/00
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2003/21]
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Gastrocknung[2002/36]
English:Process and adsorbent for gas drying[2002/36]
French:Procédé et dispositif de séchage de gaz[2002/36]
Examination procedure10.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/50]
05.03.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
03.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, TR
07.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.2005Fee for grant paid
18.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.04.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR17.05.2006
IT17.05.2006
NL17.05.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2007/37]IT17.05.2006
NL17.05.2006
Former [2007/19]NL17.05.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]US4737478  (RAINIS ANDREW [US]) [A] 1,6,8 * column 1, line 7 - column 1, line 15 * * column 9, line 21 - column 9, line 24; claims 1,6,12 *;
 [A]US4507396  (HICKSON DONALD A [US]) [A] 1,6,8 * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 11 * * column 4, line 57 - column 4, line 61; examples IX,X *;
 [A]US5985790  (MOSKOVITZ MARK L [US], et al) [A] 1,6,8 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 3 * * column 10, line 36 - column 10, line 46 * * column 12, line 30 - column 12, line 38 *;
 [A]EP0714689  (BOC GROUP PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 49 - page 4, line 16 *;
 [A]US4197095  (PICEK CHARLES R [US], et al) [A] 1,4,5 * column 11, line 9 - column 12, line 41 *
ExaminationEP0380295