Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1241701

EP1241701 - Rotary anode type x-ray tube [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.07.2005
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.08.2005  [2005/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakamuta, Hironori, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
Intellect.Property Division, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
02 / Iwase, Mitsuo, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
Intellect.Property Division, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
 [2004/13]
Former [2002/38]01 / Nakamuta, Hironori, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
Intellect.Property Division, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
02 / Iwase, Mitsuo
Intellect.Property Division, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
Representative(s)Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel
Möhlstrasse 37
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date02004031.722.02.2002
[2002/38]
Priority number, dateJP2001004864123.02.2001         Original published format: JP 2001048641
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1241701
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1241701
Date:25.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01J35/10
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/23]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Drehanoden-Röntgenröhre[2002/38]
English:Rotary anode type x-ray tube[2002/38]
French:Tube à rayons X à anode tournante[2002/38]
Examination procedure22.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
19.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2004Fee for grant paid
24.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4677651  (HARTL WALTER A M [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * * column 1, lines 43-46 * * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 24 * [Y] 4-7;
 [XY]DE19931296  (PHILIPS CORP INTELLECTUAL PTY [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * * figures 4,5; claims 7,8,11,12 * [Y] 6,7;
 [XY]US4357555  (GERKEMA JAN, et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * * column 5, lines 30-37; figure 2 * [Y] 4,5;
 [X]US4614445  (GERKEMA JAN [NL], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US4210371  (GERKEMA JAN [NL], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * * figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]WO0058639  (SEIKO SEIKI KK [JP], et al) [Y] 4,5 * the whole document * * abstract *;
 [Y]JPH10115319  ;
 [Y]JPH05302621  ;
 [Y]JPS61206141
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, [Y] 4,5 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940221), vol. 018, no. 104, Database accession no. (M - 1563), [Y] 4,5 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870203), vol. 011, no. 036, Database accession no. (E - 477), [Y] 6,7 * abstract *