Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1237113

EP1237113 - System and method for integrating pharmacy and laboratory data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.01.2011
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.02.2011  [2011/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VigiLanz Corporation
6127 Artic Way Minneapolis
MN 55436 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
VigiLanz Corporation
6127 Artic Way
Minneapolis, MN 55436 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Klass, David B.
2511 Camberley Circle
Westchester, Illinois 60154 / US
02 / Klass, Adam P.
810 N. East Ave.
Oak Park, Illinois 60302 / US
03 / Ring, Dennis J.
560 Groman Street, Unit 306
Shakopee, MN 55379 / US
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[2002/36]
Application number, filing date02004033.322.02.2002
[2002/36]
Priority number, dateUS20010272019P28.02.2001         Original published format: US 272019 P
US2001097032003.10.2001         Original published format: US 970320
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1237113
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1237113
Date:08.09.2004
[2004/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2004
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Integration von Pharmazie- und Labordaten[2002/36]
English:System and method for integrating pharmacy and laboratory data[2002/36]
French:Système et méthode d'intégration de données de pharmacie et de laboratoire[2002/36]
Examination procedure04.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/18]
15.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/08]
07.10.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
25.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
27.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200908   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2009
28.02.201009   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5348008  (BORNN ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 10,11 * page 1, column R, line 54 - page 5, column R, line 66 * * page 38, line 12 - line 21 * * page 40, column R, line 5 - page 44, column R, line 2 *;
 [X]WO9910821  (POWER MED INC [US]) [X] 1-9,12-27 * page 3, line 18 - page 5, line 2 * * page 5, line 16 - page 36, line 35 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0917078  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]) [A] 1-27 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 3 * * page 3, line 46 - page 21, line 50 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [PX]WO0186506  (MERCK MEDCO MANAGED CARE LLC [US], et al) [PX] 1-27 * page 2, line 14 - page 5, line 28 * * page 7, line 2 - page 28, line 29 * * figures 1-5 *
 [XY]  - SHABOT M M ET AL, "Wireless clinical alerts for critical medication, laboratory and physiologic data", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 33RD HAWAII INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEM SCIENCES, (20000104), pages 1533 - 1538, XP010545410 [X] 1-9,12-27 * page 1, column L, line 1 - page 5, column R, line 18 * [Y] 10,11
 [A]  - LEYERLE B J; LOBUE M; SHABOT M M, "The PDMS as a focal point for distributed patient data.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MONITORING AND COMPUTING, NETHERLANDS, (1988), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 155 - 161, XP008032271 [A] 1-27 * page 155, column L, line 1 - page 161, column R, line 14 *