Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1256373

EP1256373 - Propeller stirrer for agitating crude oil [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.10.2010
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomas Falkenstein Gewerbliche Vermietung und Verpachtung e.K.
Baierecker Strasse 59
73614 Schorndorf-Schlichten / DE
[2009/52]
Former [2004/12]For all designated states
Thomas Falkenstein Gewerbliche Vermietung und Verpachtung e.K.
Baierecker Strasse 59
73614 Schorndorf-Schlichten / DE
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
Bruno Falkenstein GmbH
Baierecker Strasse 29
73614 Schorndorf-Schlichten / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Falkenstein, Thomas
Schellingstrasse 31
73547 Lorch / DE
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Steil, Christian , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]Steil, Christian, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner, Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date02004382.405.03.2002
[2002/46]
Priority number, dateDE200112363707.05.2001         Original published format: DE 10123637
[2002/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1256373
Date:13.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1256373
Date:23.12.2009
Language:DE
[2009/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:B01F7/00, B01F3/04
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/46]
TitleGerman:Propellerrührwerk zum Aufrühren von Rohöl[2002/46]
English:Propeller stirrer for agitating crude oil[2002/46]
French:Mélangeur d'helice pour agiter l'huile brute[2002/46]
Examination procedure20.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/17]
10.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.2009Fee for grant paid
12.11.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.09.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
25.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY23.12.2009
DK23.12.2009
FI23.12.2009
IE23.12.2009
IT23.12.2009
NL23.12.2009
SE23.12.2009
TR23.12.2009
AT05.03.2010
LU05.03.2010
GB23.03.2010
GR24.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
FR31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
ES03.04.2010
PT23.04.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/43]CY23.12.2009
DK23.12.2009
FI23.12.2009
IE23.12.2009
IT23.12.2009
NL23.12.2009
SE23.12.2009
AT05.03.2010
LU05.03.2010
GB23.03.2010
GR24.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
FR31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
ES03.04.2010
PT23.04.2010
Former [2011/43]CY23.12.2009
DK23.12.2009
FI23.12.2009
IE23.12.2009
IT23.12.2009
NL23.12.2009
SE23.12.2009
AT05.03.2010
GB23.03.2010
GR24.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
FR31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
ES03.04.2010
PT23.04.2010
Former [2011/17]CY23.12.2009
DK23.12.2009
FI23.12.2009
IE23.12.2009
IT23.12.2009
NL23.12.2009
SE23.12.2009
GB23.03.2010
GR24.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
FR31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
ES03.04.2010
PT23.04.2010
Former [2011/14]CY23.12.2009
DK23.12.2009
FI23.12.2009
IE23.12.2009
IT23.12.2009
NL23.12.2009
SE23.12.2009
GR24.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
FR31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
ES03.04.2010
PT23.04.2010
Former [2011/10]CY23.12.2009
DK23.12.2009
FI23.12.2009
IE23.12.2009
NL23.12.2009
SE23.12.2009
GR24.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
FR31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
ES03.04.2010
PT23.04.2010
Former [2011/07]CY23.12.2009
DK23.12.2009
FI23.12.2009
IE23.12.2009
NL23.12.2009
SE23.12.2009
GR24.03.2010
FR31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
ES03.04.2010
PT23.04.2010
Former [2010/47]CY23.12.2009
FI23.12.2009
IE23.12.2009
NL23.12.2009
SE23.12.2009
GR24.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
ES03.04.2010
PT23.04.2010
Former [2010/46]FI23.12.2009
IE23.12.2009
NL23.12.2009
SE23.12.2009
GR24.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
ES03.04.2010
PT23.04.2010
Former [2010/35]FI23.12.2009
NL23.12.2009
SE23.12.2009
ES03.04.2010
PT23.04.2010
Former [2010/32]FI23.12.2009
SE23.12.2009
ES03.04.2010
Former [2010/22]FI23.12.2009
SE23.12.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]US4464259  (CRAMER ROY A [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1,5; claim - *;
 [X]EP0286611  (FLYGT AB [SE]) [X] 1 * figure .; claim - *;
 [X]US4431597  (CRAMER BARRY G [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1,2,4,9; claim - *;
 [A]DE19517901  (ITT FLYGT PUMPEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 6 * column 4, lines 21-29; figure .; claim - *;
 [A]DE4112511  (ITT FLYGT PUMPEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]DE19845545  (KOCH FRED [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 7,8; claim - *;
 [A]DE4004961  (KIESSLING EGON HANS [DE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *
by applicantDE4429244
 US4988303
 EP0865817
 US4464259