Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1239518

EP1239518 - Light-emitting device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.03.2013
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.04.2013  [2013/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.
1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Matsuo, Mikiko
1-868-34, Nakayamachonishi
Nara-shi
Nara 631-0013 / JP
02 / Satou, Tetsuya
31-12-203, Suehiro-cho
Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-0030 / JP
03 / Sugiura, Hisanori
60-1-517, Yamanouekitamachi
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0049 / JP
04 / Wakita, Naohide
8-1-1101, Nishiotabi-cho
Suita-shi, Osaka 564-0034 / JP
 [2012/19]
Former [2002/37]01 / Matsuo, Mikiko
1-868-34, Nakayamachonishi, Nara-shi
Nara 631-0013 / JP
02 / Satou, Tetsuya
31-12-203, Suehiro-cho, Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-0030 / JP
03 / Sugiura, Hisanori
60-1-517, Yamanouekitamachi
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0049 / JP
04 / Wakita, Naohide
8-1-1101, Nishiotabi-cho
Suita-shi, Osaka 564-0034 / JP
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/19]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2002/37]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date02004399.806.03.2002
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateJP2001006305807.03.2001         Original published format: JP 2001063058
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1239518
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1239518
Date:04.10.2006
[2006/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1239518
Date:09.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.09.2006
ClassificationInternational:H01L51/50, H01L51/52, H01L25/04
[2012/02]
Former International [2002/37]H01L25/04, H01L51/20
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2007/24]
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Lichtemittierende Vorrichtung[2002/37]
English:Light-emitting device[2002/37]
French:Dispositif émetteur de lumière[2002/37]
Examination procedure24.11.2006Examination requested  [2007/02]
25.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.12.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.2012Fee for grant paid
23.03.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.01.2007
Opposition(s)12.02.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
24.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
24.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]US5475241  (HARRAH SHANE [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 1, line 48 - line 59 * * figures 1,9 *;
 [X]GB1455195  (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,3 * figures 1,2 * * page 1, column 1, line 14 - line 25 *;
 [X]US3886581  (KATSUMURA HIROSHI, et al) [X] 1,3 * figures 1,3 * * column 1, line 58 - line 68 *;
 [X]WO0030139  (UNIV PRINCETON [US]) [X] 14 * page 3, line 1 - line 15 * * figures 1,2 *